EP2243098 - METHOD OF PROGRAM OBFUSCATION AND PROCESSING DEVICE FOR EXECUTING OBFUSCATED PROGRAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2010/43] |
Former [2009/50] | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAUCLAIR, Marc c/o NXP Semiconductors IP&L Department HTC 60 NL-5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2010/43] | Representative(s) | Krott, Michel, et al NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/43] | Krott, Michel, et al NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing Department High Tech Campus 32 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 09711184.3 | 09.02.2009 | [2010/43] | WO2009IB50504 | Priority number, date | EP20080101486 | 11.02.2008 Original published format: EP 08101486 | [2010/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009101562 | Date: | 20.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2243098 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/00 | [2010/43] | CPC: |
G06F21/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR PROGRAMMVERSCHLEIERUNG UND VERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSFÜHRUNG VERSCHLEIERTER PROGRAMME | [2010/43] | English: | METHOD OF PROGRAM OBFUSCATION AND PROCESSING DEVICE FOR EXECUTING OBFUSCATED PROGRAMS | [2010/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'OBSCURCISSEMENT DE PROGRAMME ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT POUR EXÉCUTER DES PROGRAMMES OBSCURCIS | [2010/43] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/43] | 25.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/04] | 02.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.01.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0179969 (CLOAKWARE CORP [CA], et al) [A] 1-26* abstract *; | [A]US2003236986 (CRONCE PAUL A [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * abstract *; | [X]US2005069138 (DE JONG EDUARD K [GB]) [X] 1-26 * paragraphs [0134] - [0153]; figures 21A-C *; | [Y] - GRUENBACHER H, "PIPELINING IN DER RECHNERARCHITEKTUR. PIPELINING IN COMPUTER ARCHITECTURE", ELEKTROTECHNIK UND INFORMATIONSTECHNIK, SPRINGER VERLAG, WIEN, AT, (19970101), vol. 114, no. 1, ISSN 0932-383X, pages 27 - 31, XP000688448 [Y] 1-26 * abstract * | [Y] - HENNESSY J L ET AL, "Computer Architecture. A quantative approach, passage", COMPUTER ARCHITECTURE: A QUANTITATIVE APPROACH, XX, XX, (20020601), pages 390 - 423, XP002318184 [Y] 1-26 * figure 5.4 * | [Y] - HENNESSY J ET AL, "Computer Architecture - A quantative approach, PASSAGE", COMPUTER ARCHITECTURE: A QUANTITATIVE APPROACH, XX, XX, (20020101), pages 181 - 187, XP002388271 [Y] 1-26 * paragraph [03.2] * | Examination | WO2009098630 |