EP2240573 - METHODS USING ION EXCHANGE AND GEL FILTRATION CHROMATOGRAPHY FOR POXVIRUS PURIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2017 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.2018 [2018/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi Pasteur Limited 1755 Steeles Avenue West Toronto, ON M2R 3T4 / CA | [2010/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIONG, Yelin 6 Amanda Court Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3C2 / CA | [2010/42] | Representative(s) | Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 JJ Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/42] | Cole, William Gwyn HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09711236.1 | 12.02.2009 | [2010/42] | WO2009CA00141 | Priority number, date | US20080065484P | 12.02.2008 Original published format: US 65484 P | [2010/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009100521 | Date: | 20.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2240573 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 20.08.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N7/02, C12N7/00, C12N15/863 | [2010/42] | CPC: |
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
C12N7/02 (KR);
C12N15/863 (KR);
C12N7/00 (EP,US);
G01N30/96 (KR);
C12N2710/24043 (EP,US);
C12N2710/24051 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN MIT VERWENDUNG VON IONENAUSTAUSCH- UND GELFILTRATIONSCHROMATOGRAPHIE ZUR POXVIRUS-REINIGUNG | [2010/42] | English: | METHODS USING ION EXCHANGE AND GEL FILTRATION CHROMATOGRAPHY FOR POXVIRUS PURIFICATION | [2010/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D UTILISATION DE CHROMATOGRAPHIE D'ÉCHANGE D'IONS ET DE CHROMATOGRAPHIE D'EXCLUSION DIFFUSION POUR LA PURIFICATION DU POXVIRUS | [2010/42] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2010 | Search fee paid | 09.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/42] | 13.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/03] | 29.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2013 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 13.06.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 13.06.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.07.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO03054175 (BAVARIAN NORDIC AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-7,11 * page 8, line 7 - page 17, line 16; claim - * [Y] 1-14; | [XY]WO2005080556 (CRUCELL HOLLAND BV [NL], et al) [X] 1-7,11 * page 9, line 29 - page 10, line 10; example -; claim - * [Y] 1-14; | [Y]EP1783138 (GENOMIDEA INC [JP]) [Y] 1-14* paragraph [[0017]] - paragraph [[0029]]; claim - * | International search | [X]WO2004112707 (ONYX PHARMA INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2006042414 (ONCOLYTICS BIOTECH INC [CA], et al); | [X]US7056723 (HELLER KARL [DE], et al); | [X]US2007207461 (WEGGEMAN MIRANDA [NL], et al) | Examination | - MCCREA J F ET AL, "Separation of vaccinia hemagglutinin from infectious virus particles by chromatography on DEAE columns", VIROLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 8, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0042-6822(59)90026-1, ISSN 0042-6822, (19590501), pages 127 - 129, (19590501), XP023051805 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0042-6822(59)90026-1 | by applicant | US5185146 | US5364773 | US5494807 | US5756103 | US5833975 | US6130066 | US6265189 | US6440422 | WO03054175 | - SMITH ET AL., GENE, (1983), vol. 25, no. 1, pages 21 - 8 | - MOSS ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 20, pages 345 - 62 | - MOSS ET AL., CURR. TOP. MICROBIOL. IMMUNOL, (1992), vol. 158, pages 25 - 38 | - MOSS ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 252, pages 1662 - 1667 | - SUTTER ET AL., B. DEV. BIOL. STAND. BASEL, KARGER, (1995), vol. 84, pages 195 - 200 | - ANTOINE ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1998), vol. 244, pages 365 - 396 | - SUTTER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 10847 - 10851 | - MEYER ET AL., J. GEN. VIROL., (1991), vol. 72, pages 1031 - 1038 | - MAHNEL, BERLIN MUNCH. TIERARZTL. WOCHENSCHR., (1994), vol. 107, pages 253 - 256 | - MAYR ET AL., ZBL. BAKT. HYG. I, ABT. ORG. B, (1987), vol. 167, pages 375 - 390 | - STICKL ET AL., DTSCH. MED. WSCHR., (1974), vol. 99, pages 2386 - 2392 |