EP2242527 - DEVICES AND METHODS FOR DELIVERY OF A THERAPEUTIC AGENT THROUGH A PNEUMOSTOMA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Portaero, Inc. 21631 Stevens Creek Blvd., Suite A Cupertino, CA 95015 / US | [2010/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Don 18774 Devon Avenue Saratoga California 95070 / US | 02 /
PLOUGH, David, C. 40 Valencia Court Portola Valley California 94028 / US | 03 /
WIESMAN, Joshua, P. 130 Appleton Street, 2B Boston Massachusetts 02116 / US | [2010/43] | Representative(s) | Stuttard, Garry Philip, et al Murgitroyd & Company Leeds Studio 3 84 Albion Street Leeds LS1 6AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/40] | Stuttard, Garry Philip, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2010/43] | Gover, Richard Paul Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09711701.4 | 17.02.2009 | [2010/43] | WO2009US34322 | Priority number, date | US20080029830P | 19.02.2008 Original published format: US 29830 P | US20080032877P | 29.02.2008 Original published format: US 32877 P | US20080038371P | 20.03.2008 Original published format: US 38371 P | US20080082892P | 23.07.2008 Original published format: US 82892 P | US20080083573P | 25.07.2008 Original published format: US 83573 P | US20080084559P | 29.07.2008 Original published format: US 84559 P | US20080088118P | 12.08.2008 Original published format: US 88118 P | US20090143298P | 08.01.2009 Original published format: US 143298 P | US20090151581P | 11.02.2009 Original published format: US 151581 P | [2010/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009105432 | Date: | 27.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2242527 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/00, A61M37/00, A61M31/00 | [2010/43] | CPC: |
A61K9/007 (EP,US);
A61M27/00 (US);
A61M1/04 (EP,US);
A61M13/00 (EP,US);
A61M16/0816 (EP,US);
A61M16/0833 (EP,US);
A61M16/202 (EP,US);
A61M25/02 (EP,US);
A61M25/04 (EP,US);
A61M25/10 (EP,US);
A61M39/0247 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00809 (EP,US);
A61M11/00 (EP,US);
A61M11/005 (EP,US);
A61M11/042 (EP,US);
A61M15/0085 (EP,US);
A61M15/009 (EP,US);
A61M15/02 (EP,US);
A61M2039/0252 (EP,US);
A61M2039/0276 (EP,US);
A61M2202/0208 (EP,US);
A61M2202/025 (EP,US);
A61M2202/064 (EP,US);
A61M2205/075 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/43] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABGABE EINES THERAPEUTISCHEN MITTELS DURCH EIN PNEUMOSTOMA | [2010/43] | English: | DEVICES AND METHODS FOR DELIVERY OF A THERAPEUTIC AGENT THROUGH A PNEUMOSTOMA | [2010/43] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR L'ADMINISTRATION D'UN AGENT THÉRAPEUTIQUE À TRAVERS UNE PNEUMOSTOMIE | [2010/43] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2010 | Search fee paid | 11.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/43] | 23.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/06] | 24.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2012 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 23.04.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 23.04.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.05.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 23.04.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 23.04.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.05.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5318523 (LU JIEH-SHAN [TW]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 54 - line 60; figure 5B *; | [X]JP2000197706 (HORII HIDEO) [X] 1* abstract *; | [XY]WO0204054 (CLINICAL TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [X] 1 * page 8; figure 7 * [Y] 2-15; | [XY]US2005025816 (TANAKA DON [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0071]; figure 2 * [Y] 2-15 | International search | [A]WO0170114 (RITA MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC [US], et al); | [A]US6322536 (ROSENGART TODD K [US], et al); | [Y]US2005025816 (TANAKA DON [US]); | [Y]EP1658866 (NITINOL DEV CORP [US]); | [A]US2006130832 (SCHECHTER ALAN M [US], et al); | [A]US2006137681 (VON HOLLEN DIRK [US], et al); | [A]US2007163583 (BRAND PETER J [GB], et al); | [A]US2007256688 (SCHUSTER JEFFREY A [US], et al); | [XP]US2008287973 (ASTER WALTER J [US], et al) |