EP2252365 - TEMPORARY NEUROSTIMULATION LEAD IDENTIFICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Neuromodulation Corporation 25155 Rye Canyon Loop Valencia, CA 91355 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/47] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Neuromodulation Corporation 25155 Rye Canyon Loop Valencia, CA 91355 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARKER, John M. 281 Roosevelt Avenue Ventura California 93003 / US | [2011/02] |
Former [2010/47] | 01 /
BARKER, John M. 155 Sunset View Court Ventura California 93003 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/47] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09712317.8 | 20.02.2009 | [2010/47] | WO2009US34683 | Priority number, date | US20080030506P | 21.02.2008 Original published format: US 30506 P | [2013/20] |
Former [2010/47] | US20080030506 | 21.02.2008 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009105646 | Date: | 27.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2252365 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2252365 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/08, A61N1/372, H01B7/36 | [2010/47] | CPC: |
A61N1/0553 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/47] | Title | German: | TEMPORÄRE IDENTIFIZIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR NEUROSTIMULATIONSLEITER | [2013/16] | English: | TEMPORARY NEUROSTIMULATION LEAD IDENTIFICATION DEVICE | [2010/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF TEMPORAIRE D'IDENTIFICATION D'UN FIL DE NEUROSTIMULATION | [2013/16] |
Former [2010/47] | ELEKTRODENIDENTIFIZIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR TEMPORÄRE NERVENSTIMULATION | ||
Former [2010/47] | DISPOSITIF D IDENTIFICATION D UN FIL DE NEUROSTIMULATION TEMPORAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/47] | 14.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.02.2009 | AT | 16.10.2013 | BG | 16.10.2013 | CY | 16.10.2013 | CZ | 16.10.2013 | DK | 16.10.2013 | EE | 16.10.2013 | FI | 16.10.2013 | HR | 16.10.2013 | LT | 16.10.2013 | LV | 16.10.2013 | MC | 16.10.2013 | MK | 16.10.2013 | MT | 16.10.2013 | PL | 16.10.2013 | RO | 16.10.2013 | SE | 16.10.2013 | SI | 16.10.2013 | SK | 16.10.2013 | TR | 16.10.2013 | NO | 16.01.2014 | GR | 17.01.2014 | IS | 16.02.2014 | PT | 17.02.2014 | IE | 20.02.2014 | LU | 20.02.2014 | CH | 28.02.2014 | LI | 28.02.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 20.02.2009 | |
AT | 16.10.2013 | ||
BG | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
MT | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
TR | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
GR | 17.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
IE | 20.02.2014 | ||
LU | 20.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 20.02.2009 | |
AT | 16.10.2013 | ||
BG | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
MT | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
GR | 17.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
IE | 20.02.2014 | ||
LU | 20.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BG | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
MT | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
GR | 17.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
IE | 20.02.2014 | ||
LU | 20.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BG | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
MT | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
IE | 20.02.2014 | ||
LU | 20.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
MT | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
IE | 20.02.2014 | ||
LU | 20.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
IE | 20.02.2014 | ||
LU | 20.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
IE | 20.02.2014 | ||
LU | 20.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
LU | 20.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
LU | 20.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 16.10.2013 | |
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 16.10.2013 | |
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 16.10.2013 | |
NO | 16.01.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4628934 (POHNDORF PETER J [US], et al) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]US2002147485 (MAMO GEORGE [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03008037 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03020365 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]WO03092794 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [X] 1-6,10-14 * abstract * * page 6, lines 12-19 * * page 8, line 3 - page 10, line 2 *; | [A]US2006020314 (BODNER JEFFREY P [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |