EP2250134 - GLASS SURFACE MODIFICATION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2015 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BENEQ OY Ensimmäinen savu 01510 Vantaa / FI | [2010/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAJALA, Markku Jousitie 3 FIN-01280 Vantaa / FI | 02 /
PUTKONEN, Matti Luuvanpuisto 5 FIN-02620 Espoo / FI | 03 /
AHONEN, Sampo Terästie 13 B FIN-02750 Espoo / FI | 04 /
PIMENOFF, Joe Hirsipadontie 1 F 40 FIN-00640 Helsinki / FI | 05 /
HOVINEN, Anssi Nummikuja 15 FIN-02730 Espoo / FI | 06 /
SNECK, Sami Tuulantie 22 A FIN-01400 Vantaa / FI | [2010/46] | Representative(s) | Boco IP Oy Ab Kansakoulukatu 3 00100 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2014/08] | Boco IP Oy Ab Itämerenkatu 5 00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2011/20] | Söderman, Lisbeth Karin, et al Borenius & Co Oy Ab Tallberginkatu 2 A 00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2010/46] | Keinänen, Anu Kolster Oy Ab P.O.Box 148 (Iso Roobertinkatu 23) 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 09712653.6 | 17.02.2009 | [2010/46] | WO2009FI00026 | Priority number, date | FI20080000128 | 18.02.2008 Original published format: FI 20080128 | [2010/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009103842 | Date: | 27.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2250134 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 27.08.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C03C17/23, B05D1/10 | [2010/46] | CPC: |
C03C17/25 (EP,US);
G02B1/14 (FI);
C03C17/06 (FI);
C03C17/23 (FI);
C03C23/006 (EP,US);
C23C16/403 (EP,US);
C23C16/405 (EP,US);
C23C16/453 (EP,US);
C23C16/56 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÄNDERUNG VON GLASOBERFLÄCHEN | [2010/46] | English: | GLASS SURFACE MODIFICATION PROCESS | [2010/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MODIFICATION D'UNE SURFACE DE VERRE | [2010/46] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2010 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: FI | 30.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/46] | 26.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/10] | 21.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/10] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 26.01.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 26.01.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.02.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]WO2007110482 (BENEQ OY [FI], et al); | [X]WO2004035496 (PPG IND OHIO INC [US]); | [XP]WO2008129133 (BENEQ OY [FI], et al); | [XP]WO2008059116 (BENEQ OY [FI], et al) | [X] - KESKINEN, H ET AL., "Effect of silver addition on the formation and deposition of titania nanoparticles produced by liquid flame spray", JOURNAL OF NANOPARTICLES RESEARCH, (200708), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 569 - 588, XP019506630 | [X] - VAINIO, T., "nHALO - Invisible Nanotechnology for Windows", TEKES FINNANO ANNUAL SEMINAR, (200605), URL: http://www.beneq.com/docs/presentations/2006%20May%2018%20FinNano%20Annual%20seminar%20Vainio.pdf, (20090617), XP008134750 |