EP2253498 - CONSTRUCTION MACHINE WITH FUEL FILLING HOSE STORAGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/47] | FUEL FILLING HOSE STOWAGE DEVICE | ||
[2010/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd 5-1, Koraku 2-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-0004 / JP | [2010/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMAGAI, Hiroshi c/o Intellectual Property Dept. Hitachi Construction Machinery Co. Ltd. Tsuchiura Works 650 Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | 02 /
MATSUSHITA, Makoto c/o Intellectual Property Dept. Hitachi Construction Machinery Co. Ltd. Tsuchiura Works 650 Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | [2013/37] |
Former [2010/47] | 01 /
KUMAGAI, Hiroshi c/o Intellectual Property Dept. Hitachi Construction Machinery Co. Ltd. Tsuchiura Works 650 Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | ||
02 /
MATSUSHITA, Makoto c/o Intellectual Property Dept. Hitachi Construction Machinery Co. Ltd. Tsuchiura Works 650 Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | Representative(s) | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [2013/37] |
Former [2010/47] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 09712757.5 | 20.02.2009 | [2010/47] | WO2009JP53073 | Priority number, date | JP20080040267 | 21.02.2008 Original published format: JP 2008040267 | [2010/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009104755 | Date: | 27.08.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2253498 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2253498 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.08.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60K15/04, E02F9/00, E02F9/08 | [2012/46] | CPC: |
E02F9/00 (EP);
E02F9/0883 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/47] | B60K15/04, E02F9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/47] | Title | German: | BAUMASCHINE MIT KRAFTSTOFFFÜLLSCHLAUCHVERSTAUVORRICHTUNG | [2013/28] | English: | CONSTRUCTION MACHINE WITH FUEL FILLING HOSE STORAGE DEVICE | [2013/28] | French: | ENGIN DE TRAVAIL AVEC DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE DE TUYAU DE REMPLISSAGE DE CARBURANT | [2013/28] |
Former [2010/47] | KRAFTSTOFFFÜLLSCHLAUCHVERSTAUVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2010/47] | FUEL FILLING HOSE STOWAGE DEVICE | ||
Former [2010/47] | DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE DE TUYAU DE REMPLISSAGE DE CARBURANT | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2010 | Translation filed | 13.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 13.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/47] | 13.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.02.2009 | AT | 11.09.2013 | BE | 11.09.2013 | BG | 11.09.2013 | CY | 11.09.2013 | CZ | 11.09.2013 | DK | 11.09.2013 | EE | 11.09.2013 | ES | 11.09.2013 | FI | 11.09.2013 | HR | 11.09.2013 | IT | 11.09.2013 | LT | 11.09.2013 | LV | 11.09.2013 | MC | 11.09.2013 | MK | 11.09.2013 | MT | 11.09.2013 | NL | 11.09.2013 | PL | 11.09.2013 | RO | 11.09.2013 | SE | 11.09.2013 | SI | 11.09.2013 | SK | 11.09.2013 | TR | 11.09.2013 | NO | 11.12.2013 | GR | 12.12.2013 | IS | 11.01.2014 | PT | 13.01.2014 | GB | 20.02.2014 | IE | 20.02.2014 | LU | 20.02.2014 | CH | 28.02.2014 | FR | 28.02.2014 | LI | 28.02.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 20.02.2009 | |
AT | 11.09.2013 | ||
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
BG | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
IT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
MT | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
TR | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
GB | 20.02.2014 | ||
IE | 20.02.2014 | ||
LU | 20.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 20.02.2009 | |
AT | 11.09.2013 | ||
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
BG | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
IT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
MT | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
GB | 20.02.2014 | ||
IE | 20.02.2014 | ||
LU | 20.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
BG | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
IT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
MT | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
GB | 20.02.2014 | ||
IE | 20.02.2014 | ||
LU | 20.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
IT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
MT | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
GB | 20.02.2014 | ||
IE | 20.02.2014 | ||
LU | 20.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
IT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
GB | 20.02.2014 | ||
IE | 20.02.2014 | ||
LU | 20.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
IT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
IE | 20.02.2014 | ||
LU | 20.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
IT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
IE | 20.02.2014 | ||
LU | 20.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
IT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
LU | 20.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
IT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
LU | 20.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
IT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
IT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
ES | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 11.09.2013 | |
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | BE | 11.09.2013 | |
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | BE | 11.09.2013 | |
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 11.09.2013 | |
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 11.09.2013 | |
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 11.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5082217 (PARKER PAUL D [US] ET AL) [X] 1 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 25; figures 1,2 * [Y] 3,4; | [X]US5732733 (NEGUS JOEL A [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2 * figure 2 *; | [X]JP2000070398 (SHOKASEN KIKO KK) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]JP2002266377 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [Y] 3,4 * abstract *; | [A]JP2002180497 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [A] 5 * figure 5 * | International search | [Y]JP2002089391 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY); | [Y]JP2000070398 (SHOKASEN KIKO KK); | [Y]JP2007224568 (KUBOTA KK); | [A]JPS5724122U (SEIREI INDUSTRY CO., LTD.) | by applicant | JP2003328887 |