EP2258631 - AIR-PUMP TYPE OPERATOR AND A CASING PROVIDED WITH THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yechan Co., Ltd 508 Shinwon Vision Tower Hogye-Dong 898 Dongan-Gu Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | [2015/05] |
Former [2010/49] | For all designated states Yechan Co., Ltd 508 Shinwon Vision Tower Hogye-Dong 898 Dongan-Gu Anyang-city, Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Jong Hun 10/6, 504-503 Ggum Maeul Apt. 933-6 Pyeongchon-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-070 / KR | [2015/05] |
Former [2010/49] | 01 /
LEE, Jong Hun 10/6, 504-503 Ggum Maeul Apt. 933-6 Pyeongchon-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-070 / KR | Representative(s) | Bittner, Thomas L. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/05] | Bittner, Thomas L. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/49] | Bittner, Thomas L. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09712770.8 | 19.02.2009 | [2010/49] | WO2009KR00799 | Priority number, date | KR20080016198 | 22.02.2008 Original published format: KR 20080016198 | [2010/49] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009104915 | Date: | 27.08.2009 | Language: | KO | [2009/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2258631 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2258631 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.11.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B05C17/015, A47G19/18 | [2014/32] | CPC: |
B05C17/015 (EP,US);
B65D83/00 (KR);
A47G19/183 (EP,US);
B65D47/00 (KR);
B05B11/02 (EP,US);
B05B11/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/49] | B65D83/76 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/49] | Title | German: | LUFTPUMPENARTIGE BETÄTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND DAMIT VERSEHENES GEHÄUSE | [2010/49] | English: | AIR-PUMP TYPE OPERATOR AND A CASING PROVIDED WITH THE SAME | [2010/49] | French: | ACTIONNEUR DU TYPE POMPE À AIR ET BOÎTIER ÉQUIPÉ D'UN TEL ACTIONNEUR | [2010/49] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2010 | Translation filed | 20.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 20.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/49] | 30.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2013 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 19.12.2013 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 21.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 29.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.02.2009 | AT | 28.01.2015 | BE | 28.01.2015 | CY | 28.01.2015 | CZ | 28.01.2015 | DK | 28.01.2015 | EE | 28.01.2015 | FI | 28.01.2015 | HR | 28.01.2015 | LT | 28.01.2015 | LV | 28.01.2015 | MC | 28.01.2015 | MK | 28.01.2015 | MT | 28.01.2015 | NL | 28.01.2015 | PL | 28.01.2015 | RO | 28.01.2015 | SE | 28.01.2015 | SI | 28.01.2015 | SK | 28.01.2015 | TR | 28.01.2015 | IE | 19.02.2015 | LU | 19.02.2015 | CH | 28.02.2015 | LI | 28.02.2015 | BG | 28.04.2015 | NO | 28.04.2015 | IS | 28.05.2015 | PT | 28.05.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2018/02] | HU | 19.02.2009 | |
AT | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.01.2015 | ||
CY | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
MT | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
TR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IE | 19.02.2015 | ||
LU | 19.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
PT | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 19.02.2009 | |
AT | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.01.2015 | ||
CY | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
MT | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
TR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IE | 19.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
PT | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
BE | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
MT | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
IE | 19.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
BE | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
IE | 19.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
IE | 19.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
IE | 19.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 28.01.2015 | |
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 28.01.2015 | |
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 28.01.2015 | |
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | BE | 28.02.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPS52163446U (UNKNOWN) [X] 6,7,12 * figures B(4-6) * [I] 13; | [I]FR2494604 (NORMOS NORBERT [FR]) [I] 6-8,12-14 * page 2, lines 1-18; figures 4,5 *; | [XI]US5312018 (EVEZICH PAUL D [US]) [X] 6,8-12 * column 6, line 65 - column 7, line 68; figures 13,14 * [I] 13,15; | [XI]JP2000226083 (YANO TETSUO) [X] 6,7,12 * abstract * [I] 13; | [I]US2004074923 (BANG WON-SEO [KR]) [I] 6-8,12-14* paragraphs [0013] - [0020]; figures 1,3 * | International search | [A]KR20010071210 (KARISU INTERNATIONAL YUGEN KAISHA); | [A]US2006043116 (KAWASHIRO YASUSHI [JP], et al) |