EP2262794 - SULFONAMIDE COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE AS FUNGICIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/51] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2010/51] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAMMENOS, Wassilios Alexander-Fleming-Str. 13 67071 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
LOHMANN, Jan Klaas K4, 20 68159 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
GROTE, Thomas Im Höhnhausen 18 67157 Wachenheim / DE | 04 /
DIETZ, Jochen Pfinztalstr. 7a 76227 Karlsruhe / DE | 05 /
MÜLLER, Bernd Stockingerstr. 7 67227 Frankenthal / DE | 06 /
PUHL, Michael Platanenstr.37 69493 Hirschberg / DE | 07 /
RENNER, Jens Lorbeerweg 2 67098 Bad Dürkheim / DE | 08 /
ULMSCHNEIDER, Sarah Lorbeerweg 2 67098 Bad Dürkheim / DE | 09 /
VRETTOU, Marianna Am Oberen Luisenpark 22 68165 Mannheim / DE | 10 /
RHEINHEIMER, Joachim Merziger Str.24 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2010/51] | Application number, filing date | 09713047.0 | 12.02.2009 | [2010/51] | WO2009EP51611 | Priority number, date | EP20080101863 | 22.02.2008 Original published format: EP 08101863 | [2010/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009103650 | Date: | 27.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2262794 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, C07D417/14, A01N43/40, A01N43/56, A01N43/78 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
C07D417/14 (EP,US);
A01N43/10 (EP,US);
A01N43/40 (EP,US);
A01N43/50 (EP,US);
A01N43/54 (EP,US);
A01N43/60 (EP,US);
A01N43/653 (EP,US);
A01N43/76 (EP,US);
A01N43/78 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/51] | Title | German: | SULFONAMIDVERBINDUNGEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS FUNGIZID | [2010/51] | English: | SULFONAMIDE COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE AS FUNGICIDE | [2010/51] | French: | COMPOSÉS DE SULFAMIDE ET LEUR UTILISATION EN TANT QUE FONGICIDES | [2010/51] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/51] | 24.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/13] | 08.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.05.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]WO2005033081 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [DY] 1-15 * claims 1-8; table 1 ** examples I-44--I-71 *; | [XY]WO2007093599 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * claims 1,7,11-16 * * page 11, lines 15-27; examples 95,96 * [Y] 1-15 |