EP2250518 - SUPPRESSION OF DIRECT DETECTION EVENTS IN X-RAY DETECTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.2017 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Lübeckertordamm 5 20099 Hamburg / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2013/39] |
Former [2010/46] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Lübeckertordamm 5 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUETTEN, Walter c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
POORTER, Tiemen c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
KIEWITT, Rainer c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2010/46] | Representative(s) | van Liempd, Jan, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2012/27] | Collet, Alain, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2010/46] | Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 09714052.9 | 19.02.2009 | [2010/46] | WO2009IB50691 | Priority number, date | EP20080101968 | 25.02.2008 Original published format: EP 08101968 | [2010/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009107045 | Date: | 03.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2250518 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/20 | [2010/46] | CPC: |
G01T1/247 (EP,US);
H04N25/60 (EP,US);
H04N5/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/46] | Title | German: | UNTERDRÜCKUNG VON DIREKTNACHWEISEREIGNISSEN IN RÖNTGENDETEKTOREN | [2010/46] | English: | SUPPRESSION OF DIRECT DETECTION EVENTS IN X-RAY DETECTORS | [2010/46] | French: | SUPPRESSION D'EVENEMENTS DE DETECTION DIRECTE DANS DES CAPTEURS DE RAYONS X | [2010/46] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/46] | 19.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/22] | 24.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2012 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 04.10.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 04.10.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.10.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US6201891 (INO YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-2,16,18-21,34 * column 11, line 38 - column 12, line 50; figure - * [Y] 22-24,27-32 [I] 8,17,26,33; | [XYI]US2002191828 (COLBETH RICHARD E [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6,13,16,19 * page 3, paragraph 29 - paragraph 30 * * page 3, paragraph 32 - paragraph 34 * * page 4, paragraph 37 - paragraph 42; figure - * [Y] 22-24,27-32[I] 8-12,14-15 | Examination | GB2332585 |