EP2166314 - PHYSICAL QUANTITY MEASURING DEVICE OF OPTICAL FREQUENCY RANGE REFLECTION MEASURING TYPE, AND TEMPERATURE AND STRAIN MEASURING METHOD USING THE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIKURA LTD. 5-1, Kiba 1-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | For all designated states FUJIKURA LTD. 5-1, Kiba 1-chome Kohtoh-ku Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | ||
Former [2010/40] | For all designated states FUJIKURA LTD. No. 5-1 Kiba 1-chome Kohtoh-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2010/12] | For all designated states Fujikura, Ltd. 5-1, Kiba 1-chome Kohtoh-ku Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OMICHI, Koji c/o Fujikura Ltd. Sakura Works 1440 Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi Chiba 285-8550 / JP | 02 /
SAKAMOTO, Akira c/o Fujikura Ltd. Sakura Works 1440 Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi Chiba 285-8550 / JP | 03 /
HIRAFUNE, Shunichirou c/o Fujikura Ltd. Sakura Works 1440 Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi Chiba 285-8550 / JP | [2010/12] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09714275.6 | 02.03.2009 | [2010/12] | WO2009JP53898 | Priority number, date | JP20080051344 | 29.02.2008 Original published format: JP 2008051344 | JP20080051345 | 29.02.2008 Original published format: JP 2008051345 | JP20080311286 | 05.12.2008 Original published format: JP 2008311286 | JP20080311287 | 05.12.2008 Original published format: JP 2008311287 | [2010/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009107838 | Date: | 03.09.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2166314 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2166314 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | [2011/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.09.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/353, G01B11/16, G01K11/12, G01K11/32, G01L1/24, G01K7/16 | [2017/15] | CPC: |
G01K11/3206 (EP,US);
G01B11/18 (EP,US);
G01D5/35303 (EP,US);
G01D5/35316 (EP);
G01D5/35354 (EP);
G01L1/246 (EP,US);
G01K2007/166 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/12] | G01D5/353, G01B11/16, G01K11/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/12] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM MESSUNG EINER PHYSICALISCHEN GRÖSSE MITTELS REFLECTIONSMESSUNG EINES OPTISCHER FREQUENZBANDES UND VERFAHREN ZUR TEMPERATUR-UND ZUR DEHNUNGSMESSUNG ANHAND DIESER VORRICHTUNG | [2010/12] | English: | PHYSICAL QUANTITY MEASURING DEVICE OF OPTICAL FREQUENCY RANGE REFLECTION MEASURING TYPE, AND TEMPERATURE AND STRAIN MEASURING METHOD USING THE DEVICE | [2010/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE D'UNE QUANTITÉ PHYSIQUE PAR MESURE DE LA RÉFLEXION DE LA GAMME DE FRÉQUENCE OPTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE LA TEMPÉRATURE ET DES CONTRAINTES À L'AIDE DUDIT DISPOSITIF | [2010/12] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2010 | Translation filed | 09.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2010 | Search fee paid | 09.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/12] | 06.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 07.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.05.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2003142319 (RONNEKLEIV ERLEND [NO], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,8,11 * paragraphs [0065] - [0074]; figures 1a, 4a * [Y] 3,5,7; | [XY]WO2007149230 (LUNA INNOVATIONS INC [US], et al) [X] 9,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0 12] , [0 14] , [0 15] , [0 44] - [0048] * [Y] 3 | [Y] - QINRONG YU ET AL, " DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.539986 | International search | [A]WO2005015149 (BUSSAN NANOTECH RES INST INC [JP], et al); | [A]JP2004205368 (NAT AEROSPACE LAB, et al); | [A]JPH1164119 (FUJIKURA LTD); | [A]JP2005147900 (JAPAN AEROSPACE EXPLORATION, et al) | by applicant | JP2008051344 | JP2008051345 | JP2008311286 | JP2008311287 | JP3740500B | JP3819119B | JP4102291B | - H. IGAWA; H. MURAYAMA; T. KASAI; 1. YAMAGUCHI; K. KAGEYAMA; K. OHTA, "Measurement of strain distributions with long gauge FBG sensor using optical frequency domain reflectometry", PROCEEDINGS OFS-17, (2005), pages 547 - 550 | - B. CHILDERS; M. E. FROGGATT; S. G. ALLISON; T. C. MOORE; D. A. HARE; C. F. BATTEN; D. C. JEGLEY, "Use of 3000 Bragg grating strain sensors distributed on four eight-meter optical fibers during static load test of a composite structure", PROCEEDINGS SPIE'S 8TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SMART STRUCTURE AND MATERIALS, (2001), vol. 4332, pages 133 - 142, XP055137874 |