EP2255258 - CARRIER AND BACKHOE CONTROL SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clark Equipment Company 250 East Beaton Drive West Fargo, ND 58078-6000 / US | [2010/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MINDEMAN, Spencer, L. 802-18th Avenue West West Fargo ND 58078 / US | 02 /
HIRSCHKORN, Doran, D. 512 Medora Avenue Bismarck ND 58503 / US | 03 /
LOUGHEED, Christopher, W. 937 Maplewood Avenue Litchfield MN 55355 / US | 04 /
BOGNER, Phillip, D. 5736 Lariat Loop Bismarck ND 58503 / US | 05 /
LIEBEL, Alvin, A. 3236 Riverplace Drive North Mandan ND 58854 / US | [2010/48] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/03] |
Former [2010/48] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09714583.3 | 25.02.2009 | [2010/48] | WO2009US01171 | Priority number, date | US20080031121 | 25.02.2008 Original published format: US 31121 | US20090391777 | 24.02.2009 Original published format: US 391777 | [2010/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009108305 | Date: | 03.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2255258 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2255258 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E02F3/36, E02F9/20, E02F9/26, G05B19/10, G05B15/02, G05B23/02 | [2019/29] | CPC: |
G05B19/106 (EP,US);
E02F3/3695 (EP,US);
E02F9/2004 (EP,US);
E02F9/26 (EP,US);
G05B2219/23083 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/48] | G05B15/02, G05B23/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/03] |
Former [2010/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR TRÄGER- UND TIEFLÖFFELSTEUERUNG | [2010/48] | English: | CARRIER AND BACKHOE CONTROL SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2010/48] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE PLATE-FORME ET DE PELLE RÉTROCAVEUSE | [2010/48] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/48] | 05.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.10.2017 | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.02.2009 | AT | 15.01.2020 | CY | 15.01.2020 | CZ | 15.01.2020 | DK | 15.01.2020 | EE | 15.01.2020 | FI | 15.01.2020 | HR | 15.01.2020 | LT | 15.01.2020 | LV | 15.01.2020 | MC | 15.01.2020 | MK | 15.01.2020 | MT | 15.01.2020 | NL | 15.01.2020 | PL | 15.01.2020 | RO | 15.01.2020 | SE | 15.01.2020 | SI | 15.01.2020 | SK | 15.01.2020 | TR | 15.01.2020 | IE | 25.02.2020 | LU | 25.02.2020 | BE | 29.02.2020 | CH | 29.02.2020 | LI | 29.02.2020 | BG | 15.04.2020 | NO | 15.04.2020 | GR | 16.04.2020 | IS | 15.05.2020 | PT | 07.06.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 25.02.2009 | |
AT | 15.01.2020 | ||
CY | 15.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
MT | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
TR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IE | 25.02.2020 | ||
LU | 25.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 15.01.2020 | |
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
TR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IE | 25.02.2020 | ||
LU | 25.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 15.01.2020 | |
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
IE | 25.02.2020 | ||
LU | 25.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
IE | 25.02.2020 | ||
LU | 25.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
LU | 25.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
LU | 25.02.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
LU | 25.02.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 15.01.2020 | |
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
LU | 25.02.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 15.01.2020 | |
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
LU | 25.02.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 15.01.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6061617 (BERGER ALAN DANIEL [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,10-12 * column 1, line 45 - line 50 * * column 7, line 38 - line 58 *; | [A]WO0157324 (CLARK EQUIPMENT CO [US]); | [Y]EP1538267 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [JP]) [Y] 1,2,10-12 * paragraph [0018] * |