EP2242998 - ORIFICE PLATE CARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): MT | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daniel Measurement and Control, Inc. 11100 Brittmoore Park Drive Houston, Texas 77041 / US | [2016/01] |
Former [2010/43] | For all designated states Daniel Measurement and Control, Inc. 11100 Brittmore Park Drive Houston, Texas 77041 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOGA, Thomas, Henry 7206 Windwood Court Sugar Land Texas 77479 / US | 02 /
DOOM, Ronald 9606 Dundalk Spring Texas 77379 / US | 03 /
SCHWARZ, Darren, Scott 15307 Duncan Grove Cypress Texas 77429 / US | 04 /
BLANKENSHIP, Gerald, Wayne 12414 Knobcrest Houston Texas 77070 / US | 05 /
PALMER, Robin, C. 6226 Lincoln Houston Texas 77008 / US | [2010/43] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Peter David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/38] | Holmes, Matthew Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2010/43] | Holmes, Matthew Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 09715365.4 | 11.02.2009 | [2010/43] | WO2009US33767 | Priority number, date | US20080033452 | 19.02.2008 Original published format: US 33452 | [2010/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009108500 | Date: | 03.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2242998 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2242998 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.10.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/42, F15D1/02, F16J15/00, B05B1/34 | [2013/08] | CPC: |
G01F1/42 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/43] | G01F1/42, F16L55/10, F16K3/30, F15D1/02, F16J15/00, B05B1/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/01] |
Former [2010/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BOHRPLATTENTRÄGER | [2010/43] | English: | ORIFICE PLATE CARRIER | [2010/43] | French: | SUPPORT DE PLAQUE À ORIFICE | [2010/43] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 26.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/43] | 15.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.02.2009 | AT | 06.01.2016 | BE | 06.01.2016 | CY | 06.01.2016 | CZ | 06.01.2016 | DK | 06.01.2016 | EE | 06.01.2016 | FI | 06.01.2016 | HR | 06.01.2016 | IT | 06.01.2016 | LT | 06.01.2016 | LV | 06.01.2016 | MC | 06.01.2016 | MK | 06.01.2016 | NL | 06.01.2016 | PL | 06.01.2016 | RO | 06.01.2016 | SE | 06.01.2016 | SI | 06.01.2016 | SK | 06.01.2016 | TR | 06.01.2016 | IE | 11.02.2016 | LU | 11.02.2016 | CH | 29.02.2016 | LI | 29.02.2016 | MT | 29.02.2016 | FR | 07.03.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | NO | 06.04.2016 | GR | 07.04.2016 | IS | 06.05.2016 | PT | 06.05.2016 | DE | 01.09.2016 | [2018/31] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 11.02.2009 | |
AT | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
MT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
TR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 11.02.2016 | ||
LU | 11.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 07.03.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
DE | 01.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 11.02.2009 | |
AT | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
MT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 11.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 07.03.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
DE | 01.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 11.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 07.03.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
DE | 01.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 11.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 07.03.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
DE | 01.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 11.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 07.03.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
DE | 01.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/08] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 11.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
DE | 01.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 11.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 06.01.2016 | |
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | BE | 29.02.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4370893 (COMBES MARVIN G) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 18 - line 25; figures 1-3 * [I] 4-15; | [X]US4989456 (STUPECKY JOSEF [US]) [X] 1-9 * column 6, line 49 - column 7, line 11; figures 1,2 * * column 8, line 10 - line 17 *; | [X]US5305796 (KLAK STEVEN P [US]) [X] 1,3 * figures 6,7 *; | [A]US5069252 (KENDRICK RAY [US], et al) [A] 4-15 * column 3; figures 1,2,4 * | International search | [A]US5655571 (GAWLIK DANIEL [US]); | [A]US4503594 (GALL ADAM F [US], et al); | [A]JPS5954864 (AISIN SEIKI) |