EP2248059 - UNIVERSAL SECURE REGISTRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2016 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universal Secure Registery, LLC 59 Sargent Street Newton MA 02458 / US | [2015/48] |
Former [2012/01] | For all designated states Universal Secure Registery, LLC 59 Sargent Street Newton MA 02458 / US | ||
Former [2010/45] | For all designated states WEISS, Kenneth P. 59 Sargent Street Newton, MA 02458 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weiss, Kenneth P. 59 Sargent Street Newton MA 02458 / US | [2012/01] |
Former [2010/45] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Hewett, Jonathan Michael Richard, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2015/48] |
Former [2010/45] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 09715374.6 | 26.02.2009 | [2010/45] | WO2009US35282 | Priority number, date | US20080031529 | 26.02.2008 Original published format: US 31529 | [2010/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009108779 | Date: | 03.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2248059 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2248059 | Date: | 25.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/32 | [2015/24] | CPC: |
G06F21/32 (EP);
G06F21/34 (EP);
G06F21/6245 (EP);
G06Q20/02 (EP);
G06Q20/20 (EP);
G06Q20/227 (EP);
G06Q20/3823 (EP);
G06Q20/40 (EP);
G06Q20/40145 (EP);
G06Q20/403 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/45] | G06F21/00, G07F7/10, G07F7/00, G06Q20/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/48] |
Former [2010/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | UNIVERSELLE SICHERE REGISTRIERUNGSDATENBANK | [2015/21] | English: | UNIVERSAL SECURE REGISTRY | [2010/45] | French: | BASE DE REGISTRE SECURISÉE UNIVERSELLE | [2010/45] |
Former [2010/45] | SICHERE UNIVERSALREGISTRIERUNG | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/45] | 24.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.12.2014 | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.02.2009 | AT | 25.11.2015 | BE | 25.11.2015 | BG | 25.11.2015 | CY | 25.11.2015 | CZ | 25.11.2015 | DK | 25.11.2015 | EE | 25.11.2015 | ES | 25.11.2015 | FI | 25.11.2015 | HR | 25.11.2015 | IT | 25.11.2015 | LT | 25.11.2015 | LV | 25.11.2015 | MC | 25.11.2015 | MK | 25.11.2015 | NL | 25.11.2015 | PL | 25.11.2015 | RO | 25.11.2015 | SE | 25.11.2015 | SI | 25.11.2015 | SK | 25.11.2015 | TR | 25.11.2015 | NO | 25.02.2016 | GR | 26.02.2016 | IE | 26.02.2016 | LU | 26.02.2016 | CH | 29.02.2016 | LI | 29.02.2016 | MT | 29.02.2016 | IS | 25.03.2016 | PT | 25.03.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 26.02.2009 | |
AT | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
CY | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
MK | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
TR | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IE | 26.02.2016 | ||
LU | 26.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
MT | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 26.02.2009 | |
AT | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
CY | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
MK | 25.11.2015 | ||
MT | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
TR | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IE | 26.02.2016 | ||
LU | 26.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 26.02.2009 | |
AT | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
CY | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
MK | 25.11.2015 | ||
MT | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IE | 26.02.2016 | ||
LU | 26.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
MT | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IE | 26.02.2016 | ||
LU | 26.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IE | 26.02.2016 | ||
LU | 26.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
LU | 26.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
LU | 26.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
LU | 26.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/43] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
LU | 26.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 25.11.2015 | |
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 25.11.2015 | |
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
NL | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 25.11.2015 | |
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 25.11.2015 | |
LT | 25.11.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2006016884 (BLOCK JAMES [US] ET AL) [X] 1-2,6,13,15-16,20-23,25 * paragraph [0245] * * paragraph [0288] - paragraph [0290] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0185] * * paragraph [0210] * * paragraph [0181] - paragraph [0182] * * paragraph [0230] * * figures 1,4 * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0108] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0191] - paragraph [0192] * * paragraph [0023] * [A] 7-12,14 [I] 4,18-19,24,26-28,30-31; | [XI]US2007198436 (WEISS KENNETH P [US]) [X] 1-2,6-16,20-23 * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0197] * * paragraph [0219] * * paragraph [0143] * * paragraph [0075] * * figure 28 * * paragraph [0096] * [I] 4,18-19,24-28,30-31; | [A]WO9636934 (SMART TOUCH L L C [US]) [A] 1-2,4,6,15-16,26-28 * page 6, line 32 - page 7, line 19 * * page 8, lines 9-13 * * page 8, line 31 - page 9, line 9 * * page 21, line 27 - page 22, line 16 * * page 38, lines 11-23 * * page 73, lines 19-26 *; | [A]US2005187843 (LAPSLEY PHILIP D [US] ET AL LAPSLEY PHILIP D [US] ET AL) [A] 1,15,20,30-31 * paragraph [0121] - paragraph [0140] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0155] - paragraph [0156] *; | [A]WO9207436 (SECURITY DYNAMICS TECHN [US]) [A] 1,15,20 * page 2, line 16 - page 3, line 13 *; | [T]WO0214985 (KERN DANIEL A [US]) [T] 1,15,20 * page 14, line 27 - page 15, line 7 * * page 1, lines 18-23 * * page 4, lines 9-20 * * claims 1,4,8 * * figure 12 * |