EP2265612 - SUBSTITUTED XANTHINE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONCERT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 99 Hayden Avenue, Suite 500 Lexington, MA 02421 / US | [2016/44] |
Former [2010/52] | For all designated states Concert Pharmaceuticals Inc. 99 Hayden Avenue, Suite 500 Lexington, MA 02421 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TUNG, Roger, D. 3 Burnham Road Lexington MA 02420 / US | 02 /
LIU, Julie, F. 3 Whitman Circle Lexington MA 02420 / US | 03 /
HARBESON, Scott, L. 203 Pemberton Street, Apt. 5 Cambridge MA 02140 / US | [2017/14] |
Former [2010/52] | 01 /
TUNG, Roger, D. 3 Burnham Road Lexington MA 02420 / US | ||
02 /
LIU, Julie, F. 3 Whitman Circle Lexington MA 02420 / US | |||
03 /
HARBESON, Scott, L. 203 Pemberton Street Apt. 5 Cambridge MA 02140 / US | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/14] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2010/52] | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 09715566.7 | 27.02.2009 | [2010/52] | WO2009US01294 | Priority number, date | US20080067736P | 29.02.2008 Original published format: US 67736 P | US20080134568P | 11.07.2008 Original published format: US 134568 P | US20080198715P | 07.11.2008 Original published format: US 198715 P | [2010/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009108375 | Date: | 03.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2265612 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2265612 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07D473/06, A61K31/522, A61P1/16, A61P13/12 | [2010/52] | CPC: |
C07D473/10 (EP,US);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P19/06 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P33/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D473/04 (EP,US);
C07B2200/05 (US);
C07B2200/07 (US);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/14] |
Former [2010/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE XANTHINDERIVATE | [2010/52] | English: | SUBSTITUTED XANTHINE DERIVATIVES | [2010/52] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE XANTHINE SUBSTITUÉS | [2010/52] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/52] | 17.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 06.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP17160882.1 / EP3199203 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.02.2009 | AT | 05.04.2017 | CY | 05.04.2017 | CZ | 05.04.2017 | DK | 05.04.2017 | EE | 05.04.2017 | ES | 05.04.2017 | FI | 05.04.2017 | HR | 05.04.2017 | IT | 05.04.2017 | LT | 05.04.2017 | LV | 05.04.2017 | MC | 05.04.2017 | MK | 05.04.2017 | NL | 05.04.2017 | PL | 05.04.2017 | PT | 05.04.2017 | RO | 05.04.2017 | SE | 05.04.2017 | SI | 05.04.2017 | SK | 05.04.2017 | TR | 05.04.2017 | BG | 05.07.2017 | NO | 05.07.2017 | GR | 06.07.2017 | IS | 05.08.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 27.02.2009 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 05.04.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO8700523 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1,9-11,13,14,17 * page 3, line 1 - line 10; claims 1,9 *; | [X]US5112827 (SAUNDERS J PALMER [US], et al) [X] 1,9-11,13,17,18 * claims 3-7,13 *; | [X]US5648357 (BIANCO JAMES A [US], et al) [X] 1,9-11,13,15,16 * claim 10 *; | [X]US6316458 (NADLER JERRY L [US], et al) [X] 1,9-11,13,22 * examples 3-5; claims 1-12 *; | [X] - WARD ET AL, "Pentoxifylline. A review of its pharmacodynamic and pharmacokinetic properties and its therapeutic effects", DRUGS, ADIS INTERNATIONAL LTD, (19870101), vol. 34, ISSN 0012-6667, pages 50 - 97, XP009118505 [X] 1,9-11,13-15,18-22 * page 58-60, paragraph 1.2.2-1.2.4 page 61, paragraph 1.3.1 page 65, paragraph 1.7 page 74, paragraph 3.1.6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00003495-198734010-00003 | [Y] - KUSHNER DJ ET AL, "Pharmacological uses and perspectives of heavy water and deuterated compounds", CANADIAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY AND PHARMACOLOGY, OTTAWA, ONT, CA, (19990201), vol. 77, no. 2, pages 79 - 88, XP009086918 [Y] 1,9-11 * the whole document * | [Y] - FOSTER A B, "Deuterium isotope effects in the metabolism of drugs and xenobiotics: implications for drug design", ADVANCES IN DRUG RESEARCH, ACADEMIC PRESS, LONDON, GB, (19850101), vol. 14, ISSN 0065-2490, pages 1 - 40, XP009086953 [Y] 1,9-11 * the whole document * |