EP2260205 - WIND DRIVEN POWER GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2013 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Broadstar Developments LP 1323 N. Stemmons Freeway Dallas, TX 75207 / US | [2010/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEPHENS, Thomas, G. 1323 N. Stemmons Freeway Dallas TX 75207 / US | 02 /
ELSE, Stephen, C. 1323 N. Stemmons Freeway Dallas TX 75207 / US | [2010/50] | Representative(s) | Fennell, Gareth Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/50] | Fennell, Gareth Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09715899.2 | 25.02.2009 | [2010/50] | WO2009US35163 | Priority number, date | US20080031317 | 25.02.2008 Original published format: US 31317 | [2010/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009108714 | Date: | 03.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2260205 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F03D3/06, F03D7/02 | [2010/50] | CPC: |
F03D3/068 (EP,US);
F03D7/0224 (EP);
F05B2240/124 (EP);
F05B2240/133 (EP);
F05B2270/1011 (EP);
Y02E10/74 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/50] | Title | German: | WINDGETRIEBENER ENERGIEERZEUGER | [2010/50] | English: | WIND DRIVEN POWER GENERATOR | [2010/50] | French: | AEROGENERATEUR | [2010/50] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/50] | 29.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/40] | 19.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.08.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.08.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]AU631500B (KIRKE B.K.) [X] 1 * figure 3 * * page 9, line 5 - line 11 *; | [X]WO2008022209 (BLADE SYSTEMS LP X [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 1 *; | [X]EP1457672 (BACHOT ARTHUR [BE]) [X] 1 * figure 4 * * paragraph [0035] *; | [X]WO2004074680 (EVANS LEIGHTON [GB]) [X] 1 * figure 4 * * figure 19 *; | [X]GB2241747 (GOODDEN JOHN JASON PAUL) [X] 1 * figure 3 * | Examination | US4203707 | US4406584 | by applicant | EP1457672 |