EP2260405 - TECHNIQUES TO CONSUME CONTENT AND METADATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/17] |
Former [2010/50] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLARD, James E. c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2010/50] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Michael Maria, et al Olswang Germany LLP Rosental 4 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/49] | Fischer, Michael Maria, et al Olswang Gemany LLP Maximilianstraße 13 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/50] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09715963.6 | 23.01.2009 | [2010/50] | WO2009US31821 | Priority number, date | US20080037899 | 26.02.2008 Original published format: US 37899 | [2010/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009108424 | Date: | 03.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2260405 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.09.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/00, G06Q50/00 | [2010/50] | CPC: |
H04N7/17318 (EP,US);
G06Q50/10 (KR);
G06F16/7837 (US);
G06F16/40 (EP,US);
G06F16/48 (EP,US);
H04N21/25891 (EP,US);
H04N21/41265 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/42204 (EP,US);
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/50] | Title | German: | TECHNIKEN ZUM VERBRAUCHEN VON INHALT UND METADATEN | [2010/50] | English: | TECHNIQUES TO CONSUME CONTENT AND METADATA | [2010/50] | French: | TECHNIQUES DE CONSOMMATION DE CONTENU ET DE MÉTADONNÉES | [2010/50] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/50] | 05.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.10.2016 | 04.10.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/10] | 31.10.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/10] | Divisional application(s) | EP16192117.6 / EP3133503 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.08.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO0147256 (SPOTWARE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-6,8-12 * abstract * * figure 2 * * page 7, line 9 - line 31 * * page 8, line 8 - line 11 * [Y] 7; | [YA]EP1276318 (TV LAB S P A [IT]) [Y] 7 * abstract * * figure 8 * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0053] *[A] 1-6,8-12 | International search | [X]US2003028873 (LEMMONS THOMAS [US]); | [X]US2005220439 (CARTON OWEN A [US], et al); | [A]US2006136980 (FULCHER RICHARD [US], et al); | [A]US2006259930 (ROTHSCHILD LEIGH M [US]) |