EP2254680 - FILTER DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR AIR FILTER FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2015 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mann + Hummel GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2010/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECKER, Stefan Atzelhofstr. 45 68305 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
LULEY, Oliver Karolinenstr. 24-26 67227 Frankenthal / DE | 03 /
MÜNKEL, Karlheinz Östliche Bahnhofstr. 7/1 75038 Oberderdingen / DE | 04 /
WOLF, Michael Volkerstal 3 66539 Neunkirchen / DE | [2011/01] |
Former [2010/48] | 01 /
BECKER, Stefan Webergasse 3 67346 Speyer / DE | ||
02 /
LULEY, Oliver Karolinenstr. 24-26 67227 Frankenthal / DE | |||
03 /
MÜNKEL, Karlheinz Östliche Bahnhofstr. 7/1 75038 Oberderdingen / DE | |||
04 /
WOLF, Michael Volkerstal 3 66539 Neunkirchen / DE | Representative(s) | Seyboth, Matthias Mann+Hummel International GmbH & Co. KG Schwieberdinger Straße 126 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/02] | Seyboth, Matthias Mann+Hummel GmbH Patentabteilung VR-P Hindenburgstraße 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | ||
Former [2010/48] | Seyboth, Matthias Mann+Hummel GmbH Patentabteilung VR-P Hindenburgstraße 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09716085.7 | 26.02.2009 | [2010/48] | WO2009EP52316 | Priority number, date | DE20081011186 | 26.02.2008 Original published format: DE102008011186 | DE20081062954 | 23.12.2008 Original published format: DE102008062954 | [2010/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009106588 | Date: | 03.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2254680 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2254680 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/24, B01D46/00, B01D46/52, F02M35/024 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
F02M35/02483 (EP,US);
B01D46/2411 (EP,US);
B01D46/523 (EP,US);
B01D46/60 (EP,US);
F02M35/024 (EP,US);
B01D2265/06 (EP,US);
B01D2275/208 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/48] | Title | German: | FILTEREINRICHTUNG, INSBESONDERE LUFTFILTER FÜR EINE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [2010/48] | English: | FILTER DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR AIR FILTER FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2010/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF FILTRANT, EN PARTICULIER FILTRE À AIR POUR UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2010/48] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/48] | 05.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14197084.8 / EP2878355 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.02.2009 | CY | 07.01.2015 | CZ | 07.01.2015 | DK | 07.01.2015 | EE | 07.01.2015 | ES | 07.01.2015 | FI | 07.01.2015 | HR | 07.01.2015 | LT | 07.01.2015 | LV | 07.01.2015 | MC | 07.01.2015 | MK | 07.01.2015 | MT | 07.01.2015 | NL | 07.01.2015 | PL | 07.01.2015 | RO | 07.01.2015 | SE | 07.01.2015 | SI | 07.01.2015 | SK | 07.01.2015 | TR | 07.01.2015 | AT | 26.02.2015 | IE | 26.02.2015 | LU | 26.02.2015 | BE | 28.02.2015 | CH | 28.02.2015 | LI | 28.02.2015 | BG | 07.04.2015 | NO | 07.04.2015 | GR | 08.04.2015 | IS | 07.05.2015 | PT | 07.05.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2018/02] | HU | 26.02.2009 | |
CY | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
TR | 07.01.2015 | ||
AT | 26.02.2015 | ||
IE | 26.02.2015 | ||
LU | 26.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
PT | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | HU | 26.02.2009 | |
CY | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
TR | 07.01.2015 | ||
AT | 26.02.2015 | ||
IE | 26.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
PT | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
AT | 26.02.2015 | ||
IE | 26.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
AT | 26.02.2015 | ||
IE | 26.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
IE | 26.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
IE | 26.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | BE | 28.02.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US6511599 (JAROSZCZYK TADEUSZ [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10,14-18 * abstract * * column 5, line 6 - line 55 * [Y] 1; | [Y]DE20320728U (DONALDSON CO INC [US]) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0047]; figure 8 *; | [XY]GB891854 (COOPER S MECHANICAL JOINTS LTD, et al) [X] 1-4,6,8-11,13-18 * page 3, line 25 - line 51 * * page 3, line 74 - line 89 * * page 4, line 11 - line 16; figures 2-5 * [Y] 12; | [Y]GB562103 (CECIL GORDON VOKES, et al) [Y] 12 * page 2, line 93 - line 96; figure 1 *; | [X]FR1288229 (FR DE L ACETYLENE SOC) [X] 1,3-11,13-16 * the whole document * |