EP2265950 - DETECTION OF BIOMARKERS AND BIOMARKER COMPLEXES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2019 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Angle Europe Limited Ground Floor 10 Nugent Road Surrey Research Park Guildford, GU2 7AF / GB | [2019/29] |
Former [2010/52] | For all designated states Axela Inc. 480 University Avenue, Suite 910 Toronto, ON M5G 1V2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Yixin 44 Indian Pass Stormville, NY 12582 / US | 02 /
HOULE, Jean-francois (JF) 105 Rainsford Road Toronto Ontario M4L 3N8 / CA | [2010/52] | Representative(s) | Lahrtz, Fritz Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Prinzregentenstraße 68 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/04] | Lahrtz, Fritz Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 68 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/52] | Lahrtz, Fritz Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 68 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09716287.9 | 04.03.2009 | [2010/52] | WO2009US01394 | Priority number, date | US20080068265P | 05.03.2008 Original published format: US 68265 P | [2010/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009111033 | Date: | 11.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2265950 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2265950 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543 | [2018/28] | CPC: |
G01N33/54306 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/32] | G01N33/53, G01N33/563, G01N33/52, G01N21/47 | ||
Former IPC [2010/52] | G01N33/53, G01N33/563, G01N33/52 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/04] |
Former [2010/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | NACHWEIS VON BIOMARKERN UND BIOMARKER-KOMPLEXEN | [2010/52] | English: | DETECTION OF BIOMARKERS AND BIOMARKER COMPLEXES | [2010/52] | French: | DÉTECTION DE BIOMARQUEURS ET COMPLEXES DE BIOMARQUEURS | [2010/52] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/52] | 14.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/01] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.12.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 01.12.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.12.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.08.2011 | 31.03.2015 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   27.08.2015 | 31.03.2017 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.03.2009 | AT | 23.01.2019 | CY | 23.01.2019 | CZ | 23.01.2019 | DK | 23.01.2019 | EE | 23.01.2019 | ES | 23.01.2019 | FI | 23.01.2019 | HR | 23.01.2019 | IT | 23.01.2019 | LT | 23.01.2019 | LV | 23.01.2019 | MC | 23.01.2019 | MK | 23.01.2019 | NL | 23.01.2019 | PL | 23.01.2019 | RO | 23.01.2019 | SE | 23.01.2019 | SI | 23.01.2019 | SK | 23.01.2019 | TR | 23.01.2019 | IE | 04.03.2019 | LU | 04.03.2019 | MT | 04.03.2019 | FR | 23.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | BG | 23.04.2019 | NO | 23.04.2019 | GR | 24.04.2019 | IS | 23.05.2019 | PT | 23.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 04.03.2009 | |
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CY | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IE | 04.03.2019 | ||
LU | 04.03.2019 | ||
MT | 04.03.2019 | ||
FR | 23.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 23.01.2019 | |
CY | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IE | 04.03.2019 | ||
LU | 04.03.2019 | ||
MT | 04.03.2019 | ||
FR | 23.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IE | 04.03.2019 | ||
LU | 04.03.2019 | ||
MT | 04.03.2019 | ||
FR | 23.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IE | 04.03.2019 | ||
LU | 04.03.2019 | ||
FR | 23.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
IE | 04.03.2019 | ||
LU | 04.03.2019 | ||
FR | 23.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
IE | 04.03.2019 | ||
LU | 04.03.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AT | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
LU | 04.03.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | CZ | 23.01.2019 | |
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
LU | 04.03.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | CZ | 23.01.2019 | |
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 23.01.2019 | |
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 23.01.2019 | |
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 23.01.2019 | |
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 23.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US5795725 (BUECHLER KENNETH F [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,4,6-11,14,15,17-20,23,24 * the whole document * * abstract * * column 16 - column 17; example 2 * * table 1 * * column 26 - column 27; example 15 * * column 28 - column 29; example 17 * * claims 1,4,6-8 * [Y] 26-28 [I] 3,5,12,16,21,22,25; | [XY]WO9325910 (PHARMACIA BIOSENSOR AB [SE]; STAALBERG RALPH [SE]) [X] 1,4,23 * the whole document * * abstract * * page 8, line 11 - page 9, line 32; example 1A * * figure 2 * * claims 1-2,7,10 * [Y] 26-28; | [I] - VITALI BORISENKO ET AL, "Diffractive Optics Technology: A Novel Detection Technology for Immunoassays,", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (20060101), vol. 52, no. 11, pages 2168 - 2170, XP055001779 [I] 13 * the whole document * * page 2168, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 2168, column r, paragraph 4 - page 2170, column l, paragraph 1 * * figure 1 * * page 2170, column l, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1373/clinchem.2006.072660 | [T] - LIN YIXIN ET AL, "Development of a qualitative sequential immunoassay for characterizing the intrinsic properties of circulating cardiac troponin I", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON, DC, (20100801), vol. 56, no. 8, ISSN 0009-9147, pages 1307 - 1319, XP008138880 [T] 1-28 * the whole document * | [T] - Lin Y, Bernstein G, Pak BJ, Fu Q, van Eyk J, Ndao M, Vasquez-Camargo F,Goyette S, Ward B.J, Hu W and Houle JF, "Intra-Feature and Inter-Feature Multiplexing using Diffractive Optics Technology:More Information from Less Sample.", (20090416), URL: http://www.axela.com/docs/events/14.Axela_AACC_OakRidge_Poster_2009.pdf, (20110704), XP055001983 [T] 1-28 * the whole document * | [T] - Momar Ndao, Brian J. Pak, Fabio Vasquez Camargo, StephanieGoyette, Brian Ward, J. Dick MacLean, Paul T. Smith, "Rapid Determination Of Strongyloides Infection Using A Novel Diffractive Optics Technology", (20090926), URL: http://www.axelabiosensors.com/docs/literatures/38.Rapid-Determination-of-Strongyloides-Infection.pdf, (20110704), XP055001987 [T] 1-28 * the whole document * | [T] - Lin Yixin, Fu Qin, Van Eyk Jennifer E, "Development of a novel diffractionbasedimmunoassay for characterizingthe primary and ternary structure of thecirculating form of cardiac troponin", (20100129), URL: http://www.axelabiosensors.com/docs/literatures/9.App_Note_-_Development_of_Novel_Immunoassay_for_Cardiac_Troponin.pdf, (20110704), XP055001993 [T] 1-28 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5795725 (BUECHLER KENNETH F [US], et al); | [X]US6156521 (BUECHLER KENNETH F [US], et al); | [X]US6991907 (BUECHLER KENNETH F [US], et al) | [X] - N. A. MORJANA., "Degradation of human cardiac troponin I after myocardial infarction.", BIOTECHNOL. APPL. BIOCHEM., (1998), vol. 28, pages 105 - 111 | Examination | US7314749 | by applicant | US5795725 | US6991938 | US7008794 | US7314749 | US2006099649 | - RAVI et al., Mol. Biochem. Parasitol., (20020000), vol. 125, pages 73 - 81 | - GOH et al., "Diffraction-Based Assay for Detecting Multiple Analytes", Anal. Bioanal. Chem., (20020000), vol. 374, doi:doi:10.1007/s00216-002-1478-5, pages 54 - 56, XP002246992 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00216-002-1478-5 |