EP2249702 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IMPROVED IMAGE SEGMENTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tomotherapy Incorporated 1240 Deming Way Madison, WI 53717 / US | [2010/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUCHALA, Kenneth, J. 121 Richland Lane Madison WI 53705 / US | 02 /
GERING, David, T. 520 Vanderbilt Drive Waunakee Wisconsin 53597 / US | [2010/46] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/46] | Lawrence, John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | ||
Former [2010/46] | Lawrence, John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham, West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09716288.7 | 04.03.2009 | [2010/46] | WO2009US36057 | Priority number, date | US20080033574 | 04.03.2008 Original published format: US 33574 | [2010/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009111580 | Date: | 11.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2249702 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/00, A61B5/055, A61N5/00, G05F1/00, G06T7/00 | [2012/28] | CPC: |
G06T7/174 (EP,US);
G06T7/11 (EP,US);
G06T7/143 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10081 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20128 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30004 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/46] | A61B6/00, A61B5/055, A61N5/00, G05F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM FÜR VERBESSERTE BILDSEGMENTIERUNG | [2010/46] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IMPROVED IMAGE SEGMENTATION | [2010/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR UNE SEGMENTATION D'IMAGE AMÉLIORÉE | [2010/46] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 01.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/46] | 02.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/13] | 08.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2007165920 (GERING DAVID T [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,9 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0038] * * abstract * * figure 5 * [Y] 7 [I] 3,4; | [YA] - DAVID T. GERING, W. ERIC L. GRIMSON AND R. KIKINIS, "Recognizing Deviations from Normalcy for Brain Tumor Segmentation", MEDICAL IMAGE COMPUTING AND COMPUTER-ASSISTED INTERVENTION (MICCAI 2002), (20020925), vol. 2488, pages 388 - 395, XP002664825 [Y] 7 * section 2 * [A] 1-6,8,9 | [A] - AYMAN EL-BAZ ET AL, MGRF Controlled Stochastic Deformable Model, IMAGE ANALYSIS; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS], SPRINGER-VERLAG, BERLIN/HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 1138 - 1147, (20050628), ISBN 978-3-540-26320-3, XP019010984 [A] 5,6 * section 3 * | [A] - DAM ET AL, "Automatic morphometric cartilage quantification in the medial tibial plateau from MRI for osteoarthritis grading", OSTEOARTHRITIS AND CARTILAGE, BAILLIERE TINDALL, LONDON, GB, (20070613), vol. 15, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.JOCA.2007.01.013, ISSN 1063-4584, pages 808 - 818, XP022111593 [A] 5,6 * page 810 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.joca.2007.01.013 | [A] - PITIOT A ET AL, "Expert knowledge-guided segmentation system for brain MRI", NEUROIMAGE, ACADEMIC PRESS, ORLANDO, FL, US, (20040101), vol. 23, doi:10.1016/J.NEUROIMAGE.2004.07.040, ISSN 1053-8119, pages S85 - S96, XP004609078 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neuroimage.2004.07.040 | [XP] - D GERING AND W LU, "An Automatic Contouring Method That Combines Rule-Based, Atlas-Based, and Mesh-Based Approaches", MEDICAL PHYSICS - 2008 AAPM MEETING PROGRAM, (200806), vol. 35, no. 6, page 2662, XP002664840 [XP] 1-9 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2007127790 (LAU DENNY W [US], et al); | [A]US2003139659 (DALE ANDERS [US], et al); | [A]US2007165920 (GERING DAVID T [US], et al); | [A]US2007081712 (HUANG XIAOLEI [US], et al) |