EP2257275 - KETOROLAC TROMETHAMINE COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING OR PREVENTING OCULAR PAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/49] | For all designated states Allergan, Inc. 2525 Dupont Drive, T2-7H Irvine, CA 92612 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARNES, Eldon Quinn 1260 Anacapa Way Laguna Beach California 92651 / US | 02 /
ATTAR, Mayssa 1018 Maertzweiler Drive Placentia California 92870 / US | 03 /
SCHIFFMAN, Rhett M. 1843 Temple Hills Drive Laguna Beach California 92651 / US | 04 /
CHANG, Chin-ming 11645 Maynard Avenue Tustin California 92782 / US | 05 /
GRAHAM, Richard S. 5066 Balsawood Irvine California 92612 / US | 06 /
WELTY, Devin F. 37 Tessera Avenue Foothill Ranch California 92610 / US | [2010/49] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/49] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09716497.4 | 03.03.2009 | [2010/49] | WO2009US35787 | Priority number, date | US20080067925P | 03.03.2008 Original published format: US 67925 P | US20080096096P | 11.09.2008 Original published format: US 96096 P | US20080111919P | 06.11.2008 Original published format: US 111919 P | US20090396131 | 02.03.2009 Original published format: US 396131 | [2012/08] |
Former [2010/49] | US20080067925 | 03.03.2008 | |
US20080096096 | 11.09.2008 | ||
US20080111919 | 06.11.2008 | ||
US20090396131 | 02.03.2009 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009111418 | Date: | 11.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2257275 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2257275 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/08, A61K31/14 | [2010/49] | CPC: |
A61K31/14 (EP,US);
A61K31/407 (EP,US);
A61K47/02 (EP,US);
A61K47/10 (EP,US);
A61K47/12 (EP,US);
A61K47/186 (EP,US);
A61K47/38 (EP,US);
A61K9/0048 (EP,US);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/49] | Title | German: | KETOROLAC-TROMETHAMIN-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG ODER PRÄVENTION VON SCHMERZ | [2010/49] | English: | KETOROLAC TROMETHAMINE COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING OR PREVENTING OCULAR PAIN | [2010/49] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE KÉTOROLAC TROMÉTHAMINE POUR TRAITER OU PRÉVENIR LES DOULEURS OCULAIRES | [2010/49] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/49] | 31.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11195568.8 / EP2446878 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.03.2009 | CY | 28.12.2011 | CZ | 28.12.2011 | EE | 28.12.2011 | FI | 28.12.2011 | HR | 28.12.2011 | LT | 28.12.2011 | LV | 28.12.2011 | MK | 28.12.2011 | MT | 28.12.2011 | RO | 28.12.2011 | SI | 28.12.2011 | SK | 28.12.2011 | LU | 03.03.2012 | BG | 28.03.2012 | NO | 28.03.2012 | GR | 29.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | IS | 28.04.2012 | PT | 30.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MK | 28.12.2011 | ||
MT | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
LU | 03.03.2012 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MK | 28.12.2011 | ||
MT | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MK | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MK | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 28.12.2011 | |
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 28.12.2011 | |
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 28.12.2011 | |
NO | 28.03.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0524587 (RECORDATI CHEM PHARM [CH]) [A] 1-20* example 3 *; | [A]WO2005101982 (SUN PHARMACEUTICAL IND LTD [IN], et al) [A] 1-20 * example 1 * * claims 1,4 *; | [A]WO2006071601 (ROXRO PHARMA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0040] *; | [A]US2008039398 (OUSLER GEORGE W III [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * example 1 * |