EP2265468 - SAFETY ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF SUCH A SAFETY ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2013 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Autoliv Development AB Wallentinsvägen 22 447 83 Vårgårda / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/52] | For all designated states Autoliv Development AB Wallentinsvägen 22 447 83 Vårgårda / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONDIER, Thierry 62 Allée du Sud F-76116 Servaville Salmonville / FR | [2010/52] | Representative(s) | Stornebel, Kai, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Frankfurter Straße 3c 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/52] | Stornebel, Kai, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 09717107.8 | 26.01.2009 | [2010/52] | WO2009EP00468 | Priority number, date | DE20081013526 | 07.03.2008 Original published format: DE102008013526 | [2010/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009109265 | Date: | 11.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2265468 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2265468 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/01, B60Q5/00 | [2010/52] | CPC: |
B60Q5/003 (EP,US);
B60R21/2037 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/52] | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSANORDNUNG SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SICHERHEITSANORDNUNG | [2010/52] | English: | SAFETY ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF SUCH A SAFETY ARRANGEMENT | [2010/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SÉCURITÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN DISPOSITIF DE SÉCURITÉ | [2010/52] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/52] | 10.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.01.2009 | CY | 12.12.2012 | CZ | 12.12.2012 | DK | 12.12.2012 | EE | 12.12.2012 | FI | 12.12.2012 | HR | 12.12.2012 | IT | 12.12.2012 | LT | 12.12.2012 | LV | 12.12.2012 | MK | 12.12.2012 | MT | 12.12.2012 | NL | 12.12.2012 | PL | 12.12.2012 | RO | 12.12.2012 | SE | 12.12.2012 | SI | 12.12.2012 | SK | 12.12.2012 | TR | 12.12.2012 | IE | 26.01.2013 | LU | 26.01.2013 | BE | 31.01.2013 | CH | 31.01.2013 | LI | 31.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | BG | 12.03.2013 | GB | 12.03.2013 | NO | 12.03.2013 | GR | 13.03.2013 | ES | 23.03.2013 | IS | 12.04.2013 | PT | 12.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
MK | 12.12.2012 | ||
MT | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
TR | 12.12.2012 | ||
IE | 26.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GB | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | CY | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
MT | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
IE | 26.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GB | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
IE | 26.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GB | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | CY | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
IE | 26.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CY | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CZ | 12.12.2012 | |
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 12.12.2012 | |
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CZ | 12.12.2012 | |
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | CZ | 12.12.2012 | |
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 12.12.2012 | |
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | CZ | 12.12.2012 | |
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 12.12.2012 | |
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 12.12.2012 | |
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 12.12.2012 | |
NO | 12.03.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE4317737 (TOYODA GOSEI KK [JP]) [X] 1,12 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE4227931 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US2005017484 (WORRELL BARRY C [US], et al) [X] 1,12 * column W *; | [DA]WO2006076897 (TAKATA PETRI AG [DE], et al); | [X]WO2006086163 (KEY SAFETY SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0030] , [0043]; figure -; claims 8,9 * |