EP2250217 - FLAME RETARDANT POLYCARBONATE BASED COMPOSITION INCLUDING CARBON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SABIC Innovative Plastics IP B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [2012/29] |
Former [2010/46] | For all designated states SABIC Innovative Plastics IP B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LA CAMERA, Domenico Bloemenblauwtje 71 NL-4814 TT Breda / NL | 02 /
BANFI, Biagio Via Monti 12 Porro (Como) I-22070 Rovello / IT | [2010/46] | Representative(s) | Delorme, Nicolas, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [2012/29] |
Former [2010/46] | Delorme, Nicolas, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09717249.8 | 09.03.2009 | [2010/46] | WO2009IB50982 | Priority number, date | US20080034522P | 07.03.2008 Original published format: US 34522 P | US20090356337 | 20.01.2009 Original published format: US 356337 | [2010/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009109948 | Date: | 11.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2250217 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2250217 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/04, C08K7/06, C08K7/24, C08K5/42 | [2010/46] | CPC: |
C08K3/04 (EP,US);
C08K5/42 (EP,US);
C08K7/06 (EP,US);
C08K7/24 (US);
C08K3/041 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/04, C08L69/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/46] | Title | German: | FLAMMHEMMENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG AUF DER BASIS VON POLYCARBONAT MIT KOHLENSTOFF | [2010/46] | English: | FLAME RETARDANT POLYCARBONATE BASED COMPOSITION INCLUDING CARBON | [2010/46] | French: | COMPOSITION IGNIFUGEANTE À BASE DE POLYCARBONATE COMPRENANT DU CARBONE | [2010/46] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/46] | 07.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.03.2009 | AT | 18.07.2012 | BE | 18.07.2012 | CY | 18.07.2012 | CZ | 18.07.2012 | DK | 18.07.2012 | EE | 18.07.2012 | FI | 18.07.2012 | HR | 18.07.2012 | IT | 18.07.2012 | LT | 18.07.2012 | LV | 18.07.2012 | MK | 18.07.2012 | MT | 18.07.2012 | NL | 18.07.2012 | PL | 18.07.2012 | RO | 18.07.2012 | SE | 18.07.2012 | SI | 18.07.2012 | SK | 18.07.2012 | TR | 18.07.2012 | BG | 18.10.2012 | NO | 18.10.2012 | GR | 19.10.2012 | ES | 29.10.2012 | IS | 18.11.2012 | PT | 19.11.2012 | IE | 09.03.2013 | LU | 09.03.2013 | CH | 31.03.2013 | LI | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
MK | 18.07.2012 | ||
MT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
TR | 18.07.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
IE | 09.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
MT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
IE | 09.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
IE | 09.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
IE | 09.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 18.07.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2007100023 ; | [X]JP2006273931 ; | [X]JP2005089637 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2007, no. 50, Database accession no. 2007-510158, XP002529914 & JP2007100023 A 20070419 (TEIJIN KASEI LTD) [X] 1-14 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2006, no. 79, Database accession no. 2006-771277, XP002529915 & JP2006273931 A 20061012 (TEIJIN KASEI LTD) [X] 1-4,7-11 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2005, no. 35, Database accession no. 2005-336548, XP002529916 & JP2005089637 A 20050407 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEM CO INC) [X] 1-3,7-10,14 * abstract * | by applicant | US6308142 |