EP2249196 - TRANSFLECTIVE LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Tianma Micro-electronics Co., Ltd. 889 Huiqing Rd. Pudong New District Shanghai 201201 / CN | [2010/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PENG, Xuhui 889 Huiqing Rd. Pudong New District Shanghai 201201 / CN | 02 /
LING, Zhihua 889 Huiqing Rd. Pudong New District Shanghai 201201 / CN | 03 /
NIE, Xinghua 889 Huiqing Rd. Pudong New District Shanghai 201201 / CN | 04 /
HUO, Sitao 889 Huiqing Rd. Pudong New District Shanghai 201201 / CN | [2017/46] |
Former [2010/45] | 01 /
PENG, Xuhui 889 Huiqing Rd. Pudong New District Shanghai 201201 / CN | ||
02 /
LING, Zhihua 889 Huiqing Rd. Pudong New District Shanghai 201201 / CN | |||
03 /
NIE, Xinghua 889 Huiqing Rd. Pudong New District Shanghai 201201 / CN | |||
04 /
HUO, Sitao 889 Huiqing Rd. Pudong New District Shanghai 201201 / CN | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2017/46] |
Former [2010/45] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09717315.7 | 26.02.2009 | [2010/45] | WO2009CN70541 | Priority number, date | CN20081034194 | 04.03.2008 Original published format: CN200810034194 | [2010/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009109122 | Date: | 11.09.2009 | Language: | ZH | [2009/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2249196 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2249196 | Date: | 15.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.09.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1335, G09G3/36 | [2010/45] | CPC: |
G02F1/133555 (EP,US);
G02F1/134363 (EP,US);
G09G3/3611 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/46] |
Former [2010/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | TRANSFLEKTIVE FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGEEINRICHTUNG | [2010/45] | English: | TRANSFLECTIVE LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE | [2010/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES TRANSFLECTIF | [2010/45] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2010 | Translation filed | 05.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2010 | Search fee paid | 05.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/45] | 13.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.02.2009 | AT | 15.11.2017 | CY | 15.11.2017 | CZ | 15.11.2017 | DK | 15.11.2017 | EE | 15.11.2017 | ES | 15.11.2017 | FI | 15.11.2017 | HR | 15.11.2017 | IT | 15.11.2017 | LT | 15.11.2017 | LV | 15.11.2017 | MC | 15.11.2017 | MK | 15.11.2017 | NL | 15.11.2017 | PL | 15.11.2017 | PT | 15.11.2017 | RO | 15.11.2017 | SE | 15.11.2017 | SI | 15.11.2017 | SK | 15.11.2017 | TR | 15.11.2017 | BG | 15.02.2018 | NO | 15.02.2018 | GR | 16.02.2018 | GB | 26.02.2018 | IE | 26.02.2018 | LU | 26.02.2018 | MT | 26.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | CH | 28.02.2018 | FR | 28.02.2018 | LI | 28.02.2018 | IS | 15.03.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 26.02.2009 | |
AT | 15.11.2017 | ||
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
MK | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PT | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
TR | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
GB | 26.02.2018 | ||
IE | 26.02.2018 | ||
LU | 26.02.2018 | ||
MT | 26.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 26.02.2009 | |
AT | 15.11.2017 | ||
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PT | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
TR | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
GB | 26.02.2018 | ||
IE | 26.02.2018 | ||
LU | 26.02.2018 | ||
MT | 26.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
TR | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
GB | 26.02.2018 | ||
IE | 26.02.2018 | ||
LU | 26.02.2018 | ||
MT | 26.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
GB | 26.02.2018 | ||
IE | 26.02.2018 | ||
LU | 26.02.2018 | ||
MT | 26.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
GB | 26.02.2018 | ||
IE | 26.02.2018 | ||
LU | 26.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
IE | 26.02.2018 | ||
LU | 26.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
LU | 26.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 15.11.2017 | |
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | FI | 15.11.2017 | |
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003218664 (SAKAMOTO MICHIAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6 * paragraph [0092]; figures 6-8 *[I] 3-5,7-11 | International search | [A]US2005157231 (YANG CHIU-LIEN [TW], et al); | [A]JP2005292709 (TOSHIBA MATSUSHITA DISPLAY TEC); | [X]CN1975518 (LG PHILIPS LCD CO LTD [KR]); | [X]CN1991466 (LG PHILIPS LCD CO LTD [KR]); | [A]WO2008010333 (SHARP KK [JP], et al); | [XP]CN101149540 (EPSON IMAGING DEVICES CORP [JP]) | Examination | US2005174313 | US2006098144 | US2006238675 |