EP2255162 - MOLECULAR HEATER AND METHOD OF HEATING FLUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Campbell, Mark E. 2445 Honey Creek Ave. N.E. Ada, MI 49301 / US | [2010/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/48] | Representative(s) | Coyle, Philip Aidan, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | Coyle, Philip Aidan, et al 27 Clyde Road Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2010/48] | Coyle, Philip Aidan, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 09717958.4 | 05.03.2009 | [2010/48] | WO2009US36191 | Priority number, date | US20080033974 | 05.03.2008 Original published format: US 33974 | [2010/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009111640 | Date: | 11.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2255162 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.11.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/00 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
H05B3/60 (EP,US);
Y10T137/0329 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/48] | Title | German: | MOLEKULARE HEIZVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERWÄRMUNG VON FLUIDEN | [2010/48] | English: | MOLECULAR HEATER AND METHOD OF HEATING FLUIDS | [2010/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CHAUFFAGE MOLÉCULAIRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE CHAUFFAGE DE FLUIDES | [2010/48] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/48] | 23.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/38] | 18.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.2015 | 31.03.2016 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | International search | [Y]US2002104836 (GOODSEL ARTHUR J [US], et al); | [Y]JP2003100427 (UCHU KANKYO KOGAKU KENKYUSHO K); | [A]JP2000121153 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG); | [Y]JPH0992448 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JP2000200675 (SICERAM GMBH) | Examination | WO0011914 |