EP2247967 - OPTICAL FILM AND MANUFACTURING PROCESS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 20 Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2010/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAN, Sang-Choll 106-605 Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-761 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Kwang-Seung 8-409 LG Chem Ltd. Employee House Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-340 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Kyung-Mo 113-905 Sindonga Pamillie Apt. 1001 Hongdo-dong Dong-gu Daejeon 300-190 / KR | 04 /
JO, Won-Young 303-1203 Samsung Raemian Apt. Singongdeok-dong Mapo-gu Seoul 121-765 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Jin-Hyun c/o LG Chem Ltd. Research Park 104-1, Moonji-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejon 305-380 / KR | [2015/31] |
Former [2010/52] | 01 /
HAN, Sang-Choll 106-605 Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-761 / KR | ||
02 /
PARK, Kwang-Seung 8-409 LG Chem Ltd. Employee House Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-340 / KR | |||
03 /
KIM, Kyung-Mo 113-905 Sindonga Pamillie Apt. 1001 Hongdo-dong Dong-gu Daejeon 300-190 / KR | |||
04 /
JO, Won-Young 303-1203 Samsung Raemian Apt. Singongdeok-dong Mapo-gu Seoul 121-765 / KR | |||
05 /
KIM, Jin-Hyun c/o LG Chem Ltd., Research Park, 104-1, Moonji-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejon 305-380 / KR | |||
Former [2010/45] | 01 /
HAN, Sang-Choll 106-605 Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-761 / KR | ||
02 /
PARK, Kwang-Seung 8-409 LG Chem Ltd. Employee House Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-340 / KR | |||
03 /
KIM, Kyung-Mo 113-905 Sindonga Pamillie Apt. 1001 Hongdo-dong Dong-gu Daejeon 300-190 / KR | |||
04 /
JO, Won-Young 303-1203 Samsung Raemian Apt. Singongdeok-dong Mapo-gu Seoul 121-765 / KR | |||
05 /
KIM, Jin-Hyun 108-1005 Sangnoksu Apt. Mannyeon-dong Daejeon 302-781 / KR | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/31] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/45] | Goddar, Heinz J. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09718109.3 | 03.03.2009 | [2010/45] | WO2009KR01048 | Priority number, date | KR20080019811 | 03.03.2008 Original published format: KR 20080019811 | KR20090018176 | 03.03.2009 Original published format: KR 20090018176 | [2010/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009110736 | Date: | 11.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2247967 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2247967 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/04, G02B5/02, G02B3/00, G02F1/1335 | [2013/03] | CPC: |
G02B5/0221 (EP,US);
G02B5/04 (KR);
G02B3/0037 (EP,US);
G02B5/02 (KR);
G02B5/0231 (EP,US);
G02B5/045 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/45] | G02B5/04, G02B5/02, G02F1/1335 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/31] |
Former [2010/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | OPTISCHER FILM UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2010/45] | English: | OPTICAL FILM AND MANUFACTURING PROCESS THEREOF | [2010/45] | French: | FILM OPTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2010/45] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2010 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/45] | 01.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.03.2009 | AT | 29.07.2015 | BE | 29.07.2015 | BG | 29.07.2015 | CY | 29.07.2015 | CZ | 29.07.2015 | DK | 29.07.2015 | EE | 29.07.2015 | ES | 29.07.2015 | FI | 29.07.2015 | HR | 29.07.2015 | IT | 29.07.2015 | LT | 29.07.2015 | LV | 29.07.2015 | MC | 29.07.2015 | MK | 29.07.2015 | NL | 29.07.2015 | PL | 29.07.2015 | RO | 29.07.2015 | SE | 29.07.2015 | SI | 29.07.2015 | SK | 29.07.2015 | TR | 29.07.2015 | NO | 29.10.2015 | GR | 30.10.2015 | IS | 29.11.2015 | PT | 30.11.2015 | IE | 03.03.2016 | LU | 03.03.2016 | CH | 31.03.2016 | LI | 31.03.2016 | MT | 31.03.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 03.03.2009 | |
AT | 29.07.2015 | ||
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
TR | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
IE | 03.03.2016 | ||
LU | 03.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 03.03.2009 | |
AT | 29.07.2015 | ||
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MK | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
TR | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
IE | 03.03.2016 | ||
LU | 03.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 03.03.2009 | |
AT | 29.07.2015 | ||
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MK | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
IE | 03.03.2016 | ||
LU | 03.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
IE | 03.03.2016 | ||
LU | 03.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
IE | 03.03.2016 | ||
LU | 03.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
LU | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
LU | 03.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
LU | 03.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 29.07.2015 | |
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 29.07.2015 | |
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 29.07.2015 | |
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 29.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9531737 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1* abstract *; | [X]US2007253064 (OOKUBO TORU [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0077] - [0128]; figure 1 *; | [X]WO2008020612 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [E]US2009147179 (YAMASHITA TOMOYOSHI [JP], et al) [E] 1-3 * paragraphs [0183] - [0184] * | International search | [A]KR20020061802 (SONG SAN CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20080016319 (SHINWHA INTERTEK CORP [KR]); | [X]KR20080019803 (SHINWHA INTERTEK CORP [KR]) | Examination | JPH0921907 | WO0048037 |