EP2257662 - COLOR SHIFTING MULTILAYER POLYMER FIBERS AND SECURITY ARTICLES CONTAINING COLOR SHIFTING MULTILAYER POLYMER FIBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/49] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLUEM, Gregory, L. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
FRANKEL, Joan, M. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
KRAMLICH, David, C. Alte Landstrasse 81 Küsnacht CH-8700 Zurich / CH | 04 /
BROTT, Robert, L. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
HART, Shandon, D. 4005 Pine Hil Road Corning New York 14830 / US | 06 /
LORIMOR, Lynn, E. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 07 /
FLEMING, Patrick, R. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 08 /
KOPECKY, William, J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 09 /
WILSON, Bruce, B. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 10 /
JONZA, James, M. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 11 /
ZILLIG, Daniel, J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 12 /
MITCHELL, James, G. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2010/49] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | Vossius & Partner P.O. Box 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/49] | Voortmans, Gilbert J.L. 3M Europe S.A./N.V. OIPC Hermeslaan 7 B-1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 09718222.4 | 02.03.2009 | [2010/49] | WO2009US35685 | Priority number, date | US20080034007P | 05.03.2008 Original published format: US 34007 P | US20080092165P | 27.08.2008 Original published format: US 92165 P | [2010/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009111385 | Date: | 11.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2257662 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | D01F8/00, D01D5/34, B42D15/10, G02B5/30 | [2013/34] | CPC: |
B42D25/355 (EP,US);
D01D5/34 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/036 (US);
B42D25/21 (US);
B42D25/30 (KR);
B42D25/373 (US);
B42D25/391 (EP,US);
D01F8/04 (KR);
D01F8/10 (EP,US);
D01F8/14 (EP,US);
D03D15/283 (KR);
D03D15/44 (KR);
D03D15/47 (KR);
D03D15/547 (KR);
D21H21/48 (EP,US);
G02B6/02 (US);
G02B6/02033 (US);
G02B6/02042 (US);
B42D2033/32 (EP);
B42D2035/24 (EP);
D10B2401/20 (KR);
D10B2501/00 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/49] | D01D5/30, D01D5/34, B42D15/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/49] | Extension states | RS | 29.09.2010 | Title | German: | FARBVERÄNDERNDE MEHRSCHICHTIGE POLYMERFASERN UND SICHERHEITSARTIKEL MIT FARBVERÄNDERNDEN MEHRSCHICHTIGEN POLYMERFASERN | [2010/49] | English: | COLOR SHIFTING MULTILAYER POLYMER FIBERS AND SECURITY ARTICLES CONTAINING COLOR SHIFTING MULTILAYER POLYMER FIBERS | [2010/49] | French: | FIBRES DE POLYMÈRES MULTICOUCHES CAPABLES DE VARIATIONS CHROMATIQUES ET ARTICLES DE SÉCURITÉ CONTENANT CES FIBRES DE POLYMÈRES | [2010/49] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/49] | 20.08.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1006221 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al) [I] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] - [0019]; examples 1-11; table 4 *; | [I]US2002016117 (HAMAJIMA NORIMITSU [JP], et al) [I] 1,2,5,6 * paragraphs [0013] - [0017] - [0037] , [0052] - [0059]; figures 1b,1c *; | [Y]EP1498545 (FLEX PRODUCTS INC A JDS UNIPHA [US]) [Y] 10,11* abstract *; | [XI]US2006194487 (OUDERKIRK ANDREW J [US], et al) [X] 8 * paragraphs [0076] - [0084]; figures 4B,4C; table 1 * * paragraphs [0130] , [0131] , [0135]; figure 9 * * abstract * [I] 1-6; | [XDYI]US7327923 (HART SHANDON D [US], et al) [XD] 5,7-9 * column 5, line 53 - column 7, line 32; figures 2A,2B,3C,6,7; claims 1,2,8,11,12,13; table 1 * * column 11, line 10 - column 12, line 14 * * column 13, lines 9-33 * [Y] 10,11 [I] 3,4,6 | International search | [A]US5881196 (PHILLIPS STEPHEN [US]); | [A]US6974618 (KUMACHEVA EUGENIA [CA], et al); | [A]US2007019917 (BAYINDIR MEHMET [US], et al); | [A]WO2007042177 (SMART HOLOGRAMS LTD [GB], et al) |