EP2248313 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ADAPTIVE TRANSMIT EQUALIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agere Systems, Inc. 1110 American Parkway, NE Allentown, PA 18109 / US | [2010/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOBIN, Mohammad, S. 827 Rebecca Lane Orefield PA 18069 / US | 02 /
SHEETS, Gregory, W. 121 Houghton Lane Boxborough, MA 01719 / US | 03 /
SMITH, Lane, A. 905 Schuyler Drive Easton PA 18040 / US | 04 /
TRACY, Paul, H. 4342 Bachman Drive Schnecksville PA 18078 / US | [2011/01] |
Former [2010/45] | 01 /
MOBIN, Mohammad, S. 827 Rebecca Lane Orefield PA 18069 / US | ||
02 /
SHEETS, Gregory, W. 1063 Mosser Road Apartment B101 Breinigsville PA 18031 / US | |||
03 /
SMITH, Lane, A. 905 Schuyler Drive Easton PA 18040 / US | |||
04 /
TRACY, Paul, H. 4342 Bachman Drive Schnecksville PA 18078 / US | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [2014/44] |
Former [2010/45] | Williams, David John Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 09718360.2 | 10.02.2009 | [2010/45] | WO2009US33640 | Priority number, date | US20080040575 | 29.02.2008 Original published format: US 40575 | [2010/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009111137 | Date: | 11.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2248313 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/03 | [2010/45] | CPC: |
H04L25/03006 (EP,US);
H04L2025/0377 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03808 (EP,US);
H04L25/03343 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ADAPTIVEN SENDERENTZERRUNG | [2010/45] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ADAPTIVE TRANSMIT EQUALIZATION | [2010/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREILS POUR ÉGALISATION D'ÉMETTEUR PARTENAIRE DANS UNE LIAISON ADAPTATIVE | [2010/45] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/45] | 27.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/06] | 05.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.01.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005281343 (HSU LOUIS L [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0008] * * paragraphs [0010] - [0012] * * paragraphs [0015] - [0027] * * paragraphs [0037] - [0055] * * figures 3-9 *; | [Y]US2007268962 (MOBIN MOHAMMAD S [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0009] * * paragraphs [0019] - [0043] * * figures 1-8 *; | [Y]US2007253477 (ABEL CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraphs [0017] - [0037] * * paragraphs [0001] - [0009] *; | [Y]US2002060820 (BUCHALI FRED [DE]) [Y] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0007] * * paragraphs [0018] - [0029] * * figures 1-6 *; | [X]EP0492856 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [X] 1-3,10-12,19,20 * abstract * * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 44 * * column 3, line 1 - line 57 * * column 4, line 48 - column 5, line 55 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP1643678 (AGERE SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,10,19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] - [0024] * * paragraphs [0026] - [0078] * | by applicant | US2005281343 | US2007268962 | US2007253477 | US2002060820 | EP0492856 |