EP2255388 - INFORMATION RECORDING DEVICE AND INFORMATION RECORDING/REPRODUCTION SYSTEM INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.12.2014 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.01.2015 [2015/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2010/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARAKI, Takeshi c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 02 /
TSUKAMOTO, Takayuki c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1 Shibaura1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 03 /
YAMAGUCHI, Takeshi c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2010/48] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09718835.3 | 10.03.2009 | [2010/48] | WO2009JP54978 | Priority number, date | JP20080064671 | 13.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008064671 | [2010/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009113699 | Date: | 17.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2255388 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.09.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01L45/00 | [2014/02] | CPC: |
H10N70/24 (EP,KR,US);
H10N70/20 (KR);
H10N70/026 (EP,KR,US);
H10N70/826 (EP,KR,US);
H10N70/8833 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/48] | H01L27/10, H01L45/00, H01L49/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/48] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSAUFZEICHNUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND INFORMATIONSAUFZEICHNUNGS-/WIEDERGABESYSTEM DAMIT | [2010/48] | English: | INFORMATION RECORDING DEVICE AND INFORMATION RECORDING/REPRODUCTION SYSTEM INCLUDING THE SAME | [2010/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENREGISTREMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET SYSTÈME D'ENREGISTREMENT/DE REPRODUCTION D'INFORMATIONS LE COMPRENANT | [2010/48] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/48] | 17.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/05] | 12.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2007020832 (NAT INST OF ADVANCED IND SCIEN [JP], et al); | [A]US2007240995 (ODAGAWA AKIHIRO [JP], et al); | [XY]WO2007145295 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al); | [P]US2009046496 (KATOH YOSHIKAZU [JP]); | US2010012911 [ ] (AKINAGA HIROYUKI [JP], et al); | International search | [Y]JP2000344599 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JP2002537627 ; | [X]JP2006279042 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [Y]JP2007258533 (FUJITSU LTD); | [X]JP2007533118 ; | [AP]JP2008205191 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [AP]JP2008310856 (TOSHIBA CORP) |