EP2255624 - INHIBITOR FOR GROWTH OF BACTERIA OF GENUS LEGIONELLA, BATH AGENT AND CLEANING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POKKA CORPORATION 4-2-29, Sakae Naka-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 460-8415 / JP | [2010/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOTO, Takaki c/o POKKA CORPORATION 45-2, Kumanosyoujyuuniso Kitanagoya-shi Aichi 481-8515 / JP | 02 /
FUKUMOTO, Syuichi c/o POKKA CORPORATION 45-2, Kumanosyoujyuuniso Kitanagoya-shi Aichi 481-8515 / JP | [2010/48] | Representative(s) | Melin Granberg, Linda, et al Groth & Co KB P.O. Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | Melin Granberg, Linda, et al Groth & Co KB P.O. Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 09718879.1 | 26.02.2009 | [2010/48] | WO2009JP53607 | Priority number, date | JP20080059780 | 10.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008059780 | [2010/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009113404 | Date: | 17.09.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2255624 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.09.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/16, A01N65/18, A01P3/00, A61K8/49, A61K8/97, A61K31/352, A61K36/47, A61P31/04, A61Q19/10 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
A01N65/18 (EP,US);
A01N43/16 (EP,US);
A01N65/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/352 (EP,US);
A61K36/47 (EP,US);
A61K8/9789 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61Q19/10 (EP,US);
A61K2800/524 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/48] | Title | German: | HEMMER FÜR DAS WACHSTUM VON LEGIONELLEN, BADEMITTEL UND REINIGUNGSMITTEL | [2010/48] | English: | INHIBITOR FOR GROWTH OF BACTERIA OF GENUS LEGIONELLA, BATH AGENT AND CLEANING AGENT | [2010/48] | French: | INHIBITEUR DE CROISSANCE D'UNE BACTÉRIE DU GENRE LEGIONELLA, AGENT POUR BAINS ET AGENT DE NETTOYAGE | [2010/48] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2010 | Translation filed | 13.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2010 | Search fee paid | 13.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/48] | 27.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/06] | 26.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1640371 (POKKA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5 * claims 12,17 * * paragraph [0037] * * tables 3,4 *; | [X]JP2007045754 ; | [X]JP2007039365 ; | [X]JP2006008552 ; | [E]EP2216037 (POKKA CORP [JP]) [E] 1-5 * claims 1-5 * * paragraphs [0039] , [0046] , [0047] * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2007, no. 33, Database accession no. 2007-347710, XP002694853 & JP2007045754 A 20070222 (POKKA CORP) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * claims 2,3,8,9,10 * * paragraphs [0024] , [0025] , [0060]; examples 1-11 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2007, no. 31, Database accession no. 2007-316003, XP002642171 & JP2007039365 A 20070215 (POKKA CORP) [X] 1-5 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2006, no. 08, Database accession no. 2006-073494, XP002642170 & JP2006008552 A 20060112 (POKKA CORP) [X] 1-5 * abstract * | International search | [X]JP2007045754 (POKKA CORP); | [X]WO2004113318 (POKKA CORP [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2006045077 | JP2007045754 |