EP2280752 - VETERINARY SYRINGE FOR MULTIPLE INJECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.05.2019 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merial, Inc. 3239 Satellite Boulevard, Bldg. 500 Duluth, GA 30096 / US | [2017/47] |
Former [2011/06] | For all designated states Merial Ltd. 3239 Satellite Blvd. Duluth, GA 30096 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLMES, Robert William Lachlan 15 Calman Place Chatswood North Shore City Auckland 0626 / NZ | 02 /
WALKER, Rodney Gordon 35 Puketaha Road RD 1 Hamilton 3281 / NZ | 03 /
EBBETT, Todd Donald 9 Rata Street Maeroa Hamilton 3200 / NZ | 04 /
STANDING, Colin Anthony 15 Roderick Place Rototuna Hamilton 3210 / NZ | 05 /
WILLIAMS, Peter Robert 40 Melbourne Street Concord Sydney, New South Wales 2137 / AU | 06 /
CIAMPA, Giovanni 91 Tennyson Road Gladesville Sydney, New South Wales 2111 / AU | 07 /
ROSSIGNUOLO, Michael 1/42 Carbeen Drive Bundoora Melbourne, Victoria 3083 / AU | 08 /
SMITH, Robert John 9 Sorrie Street Balmain Sydney, New South Wales 2041 / AU | [2011/06] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/06] | Harding, Charles Thomas D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn GB-London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 09718945.0 | 11.03.2009 | [2011/06] | WO2009NZ00035 | Priority number, date | NZ20080566713 | 14.03.2008 Original published format: NZ 56671308 | [2011/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009113883 | Date: | 17.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2280752 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 17.09.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/24, A61M5/28, A61M5/00 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
A61M5/00 (EP,US);
A61M5/178 (US);
A61M5/24 (EP,US);
A61M5/2425 (EP,US);
A61M5/3204 (EP,US);
A61D17/00 (US);
A61M2005/005 (EP,US);
A61M2005/2414 (EP,US);
A61M2005/2481 (EP,US);
A61M2005/31516 (EP,US);
A61M2250/00 (EP,US);
A61M5/2459 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/06] | A61M5/24, A61M5/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/06] | Title | German: | VETERINÄRMEDIZINISCHE SPRITZE FÜR MEHRERE INJEKTIONEN | [2011/06] | English: | VETERINARY SYRINGE FOR MULTIPLE INJECTIONS | [2011/06] | French: | SERINGUE VÉTÉRINAIRE POUR INJECTIONS MULTIPLES | [2011/06] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2010 | Search fee paid | 18.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 18.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/06] | 25.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 15.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.01.2019 | 21.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/24] | 02.02.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/24] | Divisional application(s) | EP18214156.4 / EP3513823 | EP18214177.0 / EP3520840 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.09.2017 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 18.11.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 18.11.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.12.2010 | Decision despatched | 18.11.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 18.11.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.12.2010 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 18.11.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 18.11.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.12.2010 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 18.11.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 18.11.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.12.2010 | Decision despatched | 18.11.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 18.11.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.12.2010 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 18.11.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 18.11.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.12.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO03015846 (DANTONIO CONSULTANTS INT [US]) [X] 1-3,15 * page 16, line 12 - line 32; figure 7a * * page 22, line 6 - page 24, line 21; figures 10a-12b *[A] 4-14 | International search | [A]US2892457 (HARRY STURTZ); | [X]US4738664 (PRINDLE GORDON E [US]); | [X]US5022563 (MARCHITTO MICHAEL [US], et al); | [X]AU652664B (ENZACOR AUSTRALIA PTY LTD, et al); | [X]US5692642 (BRATTESANI STEVEN J [US]); | [X]US5964736 (LANE DONOVAN R [US]); | [X]US2008058732 (HARRIS ARTHUR [US]) | Examination | US3051172 |