EP2253668 - FLUIDITY IMPROVER FOR AROMATIC POLYCARBONATE RESIN, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE FLUIDITY IMPROVER FOR AROMATIC POLYCARBONATE RESIN, AROMATIC POLYCARBONATE RESIN COMPOSITION, AND MOLDED PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2015 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd. 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8253 / JP | For all designated states Koito Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 4-8-3, Takanawa Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8711 / JP | [2014/50] |
Former [2010/47] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd. 6-41, Konan 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8506 / JP | ||
For all designated states Koito Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 4-8-3, Takanawa Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8711 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUOKA, Shinji c/o Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd. Corporate Research Laboratories 20-1 Miyuki-cho Otake-shi Hiroshima 739-0693 / JP | 02 /
ANMA, Hidetaka c/o KOITO MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. Shizuoka Plant 500 Kitawaki Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi Shizuoka 424-8764 / JP | 03 /
MIYAKE, Kazuyuki c/o KOITO MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. Shizuoka Plant 500 Kitawaki Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi Shizuoka 424-8764 / JP | [2014/50] |
Former [2010/47] | 01 /
MATSUOKA, Shinji c/o Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd. Corporate Research Laboratories 20-1 Miyuki-cho Otake-shi Hiroshima 739-0693 / JP | ||
02 /
ANMA, Hidetaka c/o KOITO MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. Shizuoka Plant 500 Kitawaki Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi Shizuoka 424-8764 / JP | |||
03 /
MIYAKE, Kazuyuki c/o KOITO MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. Shizuoka Plant 500 Kitawaki Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi Shizuoka 424-8764 / JP | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/50] | Merkle, Gebhard Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/47] | Merkle, Gebhard TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09719203.3 | 11.03.2009 | [2010/47] | WO2009JP54651 | Priority number, date | JP20080060889 | 11.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008060889 | [2010/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009113573 | Date: | 17.09.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2253668 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2253668 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.09.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08F265/06, C08F257/02, C08L51/00, C08L25/16, C08L25/14, C08L69/00, C08F2/44 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
C08L25/16 (EP,US);
C08F257/02 (EP,US);
C08F265/06 (EP,US);
C08L25/14 (EP,US);
C08L69/00 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F257/02, C08F220/1806, C08F212/08 (EP,US);
C08L25/14, C08L2666/06 (US,EP);
C08L25/16, C08L2666/06 (US,EP);
C08L69/00, C08L2666/04 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2011/27] | C08L69/00, C08F2/44, C08F257/02, C08L25/04, C08L51/00, C08F265/06 | ||
Former IPC [2010/47] | C08L69/00, C08F2/44, C08F257/02, C08L25/04, C08L51/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/47] | Title | German: | FLIESSFÄHIGKEITSVERBESSERER FÜR AROMATISCHES POLYCARBONATHARZ, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES FLIESSFÄHIGKEITSVERBESSERERS FÜR AROMATISCHES POLYCARBONATHARZ, AROMATISCHE POLYCARBONATHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND FORMPRODUKT | [2010/47] | English: | FLUIDITY IMPROVER FOR AROMATIC POLYCARBONATE RESIN, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE FLUIDITY IMPROVER FOR AROMATIC POLYCARBONATE RESIN, AROMATIC POLYCARBONATE RESIN COMPOSITION, AND MOLDED PRODUCT | [2010/47] | French: | AGENT D'AMÉLIORATION DE LA FLUIDITÉ POUR UNE RÉSINE DE POLYCARBONATE AROMATIQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE L'AGENT AMÉLIORANT LA FLUIDITÉ POUR UNE RÉSINE DE POLYCARBONATE AROMATIQUE, COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE DE POLYCARBONATE AROMATIQUE ET PRODUIT MOULÉ | [2010/47] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2010 | Translation filed | 14.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/47] | 30.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 11.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.03.2009 | AT | 10.12.2014 | BG | 10.12.2014 | CY | 10.12.2014 | CZ | 10.12.2014 | DK | 10.12.2014 | EE | 10.12.2014 | ES | 10.12.2014 | FI | 10.12.2014 | HR | 10.12.2014 | IT | 10.12.2014 | LT | 10.12.2014 | LV | 10.12.2014 | MC | 10.12.2014 | MK | 10.12.2014 | MT | 10.12.2014 | PL | 10.12.2014 | RO | 10.12.2014 | SE | 10.12.2014 | SI | 10.12.2014 | SK | 10.12.2014 | TR | 10.12.2014 | NO | 10.03.2015 | GR | 11.03.2015 | IE | 11.03.2015 | LU | 11.03.2015 | CH | 31.03.2015 | LI | 31.03.2015 | IS | 10.04.2015 | PT | 10.04.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 11.03.2009 | |
AT | 10.12.2014 | ||
BG | 10.12.2014 | ||
CY | 10.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
MT | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
TR | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IE | 11.03.2015 | ||
LU | 11.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
MT | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IE | 11.03.2015 | ||
LU | 11.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IE | 11.03.2015 | ||
LU | 11.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IE | 11.03.2015 | ||
LU | 11.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LU | 11.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LU | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LU | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LU | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 10.12.2014 | |
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 10.12.2014 | |
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 10.12.2014 | |
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 10.12.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2008081791 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP], et al) [XP] 1,2,5-9 * the whole document *; | [E]EP2100918 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [E] 1,2,5-9 * examples 1-7; claims 1-7 *; | [X]JP2007039490 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]JP2006257195 (TEIJIN CHEMICALS LTD) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102004059243 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | International search | [AP]WO2008081791 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP], et al); | [A]JP2007039490 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO); | [A]JPH01165656 (BAYER AG) | by applicant | JP2006306958 |