EP2252785 - EXHAUST GAS SENSOR CONTROL SYSTEM AND CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2012/17] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2010/47] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENOMOTO, Hiroshi c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha of 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
MATSUNAGA, Akio c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha of 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [2012/17] |
Former [2010/47] | 01 /
ENOMOTO, Hiroshi c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha of 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | ||
02 /
MATSUNAGA, Akio c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha of 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Representative(s) | Smith, Samuel Leonard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2012/17] |
Former [2010/47] | Smith, Samuel Leonard J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09719611.7 | 12.03.2009 | [2010/47] | WO2009IB05060 | Priority number, date | JP20080064644 | 13.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008064644 | JP20080075675 | 24.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008075675 | [2010/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009112947 | Date: | 17.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2252785 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2252785 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/14 | [2010/47] | CPC: |
F02D41/1494 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0414 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0418 (EP,US);
F02D41/1446 (EP,US);
F02D41/187 (EP,US);
F02D41/222 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/47] | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSSYSTEM UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINEN ABGASSENSOR | [2010/47] | English: | EXHAUST GAS SENSOR CONTROL SYSTEM AND CONTROL METHOD | [2010/47] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMANDE DE DETECTEUR DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE | [2010/47] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/47] | 24.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.03.2009 | AT | 25.04.2012 | BE | 25.04.2012 | CY | 25.04.2012 | CZ | 25.04.2012 | DK | 25.04.2012 | EE | 25.04.2012 | FI | 25.04.2012 | HR | 25.04.2012 | IT | 25.04.2012 | LT | 25.04.2012 | LV | 25.04.2012 | MK | 25.04.2012 | MT | 25.04.2012 | NL | 25.04.2012 | PL | 25.04.2012 | RO | 25.04.2012 | SE | 25.04.2012 | SI | 25.04.2012 | SK | 25.04.2012 | TR | 25.04.2012 | BG | 25.07.2012 | NO | 25.07.2012 | GR | 26.07.2012 | ES | 05.08.2012 | IS | 25.08.2012 | PT | 27.08.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
MK | 25.04.2012 | ||
MT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
TR | 25.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
MT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 25.04.2012 | |
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 25.04.2012 | |
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 25.04.2012 | |
NO | 25.07.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2007113539 (NAKANO SHUICHI [JP]) [X] 1-18 * paragraphs [0020] - [0025]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0034] - [0038]; figure 3 * * paragraphs [0044] - [0047]; figure 5 *; | [A]US2007204840 (ABE HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1-18* paragraph [0043]; figure 2B *; | [A]US2007271904 (SHOUDA HIROFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0029] - [0033]; figure 1 * |