EP2251252 - DOOR REMOVING SYSTEM AND DOOR REMOVING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama, 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/46] | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIKURUBE, Atsushi c/o HONDA ENGINEERING CO. LTD. 6-1, Hagadai Hagamachi Hagagun Tochigi 321-3395 / JP | 02 /
SHIBAYAMA, Takao c/o HONDA ENGINEERING CO. LTD. 6-1, Hagadai Hagamachi Hagagun Tochigi 321-3395 / JP | 03 /
ASAMIZU, Kenichi c/o HONDA ENGINEERING CO. LTD. 6-1, Hagadai Hagamachi Hagagun Tochigi 321-3395 / JP | 04 /
ISHIDA, Taketo c/o HONDA ENGINEERING CO. LTD. 6-1, Hagadai Hagamachi Hagagun Tochigi 321-3395 / JP | 05 /
ISHIKAWA, Yoshio c/o HONDA ENGINEERING CO. LTD. 6-1, Hagadai Hagamachi Hagagun Tochigi 321-3395 / JP | 06 /
MAEDA, Mitsuo c/o HONDA ENGINEERING CO. LTD. 6-1, Hagadai Hagamachi Hagagun Tochigi 321-3395 / JP | [2010/46] | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/46] | Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09719632.3 | 16.02.2009 | [2010/46] | WO2009JP52530 | Priority number, date | JP20080060278 | 10.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008060278 | JP20080060279 | 10.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008060279 | JP20080060280 | 10.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008060280 | JP20080060282 | 10.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008060282 | [2010/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009113360 | Date: | 17.09.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2251252 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.09.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B62D65/00, B23P19/04, B23P19/06, B23P21/00, B25J9/06 | [2010/46] | CPC: |
B62D65/06 (EP,US);
B25J9/0084 (EP,US);
B25J9/0087 (EP,US);
B25J9/1682 (EP,US);
G05B2219/39156 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/46] | Title | German: | TÜRENTFERNUNGSSYSTEM UND TÜRENTFERNUNGSVERFAHREN | [2010/46] | English: | DOOR REMOVING SYSTEM AND DOOR REMOVING METHOD | [2010/46] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ENLÈVEMENT DE PORTE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ENLÈVEMENT DE PORTE | [2010/46] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2010 | Translation filed | 09.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 09.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/46] | 14.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/52] | 14.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH03264221 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1800808 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 6 - paragraph 8 * * page 3, paragraph 23 - paragraph 24 *; | [A]DE19605070 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 4 - line 59 *; | [A]US2007087609 (ISOTANI SEIJI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * page 2, paragraph 56 - page 5, paragraph 106; figures 1-21 *; | [A]GB2176445 (FATA EUROP GROUP) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH03264221 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JPH08174460 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [Y]JP2007111794 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [Y]JP2000246684 (SHARP KK); | [Y]JP2006255829 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]JPS61288945 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JPS63283832 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2000296427 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) | by applicant | JPH09103925 |