EP2262367 - ORAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS OF BUPRENORPHINE AND METHOD OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Relmada Therapeutics, Inc. 146 Medinah Drive Blue Bell, PA 19422-3212 / US | [2012/16] |
Former [2010/51] | For all designated states Theraquest Biosciences, Inc. 146 Medinah Drive Blue Bell, PA 19422-3212 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BABUL, Najib 146 Medinah Drive Blue Bell PA 19422-3212 / US | 02 /
REHNI, Ashish, Kumar 39 Gurmat Colony Sular Road Patiala 147001 / IN | [2010/51] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Bond, Christopher William, et al Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/13] | Walker, Ross Thomson, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/51] | Walker, Ross Thomson, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09719755.2 | 09.03.2009 | [2010/51] | WO2009US01502 | Priority number, date | US20080064505P | 08.03.2008 Original published format: US 64505 P | [2010/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009114118 | Date: | 17.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2262367 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/42, A61K31/44 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
C07D489/12 (EP,US);
A61K31/485 (EP,US);
A61K9/1635 (EP,US);
A61K9/1652 (EP,US);
A61K9/1664 (EP,US);
A61K9/2018 (EP,US);
A61K9/2027 (EP,US);
A61K9/2054 (EP,US);
A61K9/2866 (EP,US);
A61K9/5078 (EP,US);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/51] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ORALZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN VON BUPRENORPHIN UND VERFAHREN FÜR IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2010/51] | English: | ORAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS OF BUPRENORPHINE AND METHOD OF USE | [2010/51] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES ORALES DE BUPRÉNORPHINE ET PROCÉDÉ D UTILISATION | [2010/51] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/51] | 17.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/46] | 29.03.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 28.09.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/46] | Appeal following examination | 29.05.2018 | Appeal received No. T2418/18 | 25.07.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.09.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.03.2013 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 09.02.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 09.02.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.02.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.01.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 08.01.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.01.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 09.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.08.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003124185 (OSHLACK BENJAMIN [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0079] , [0 88] - [0093] - [ 101] , [ 107] - [0182] * * Examples ** Claims *; | [X]WO2007087452 (THERAQUEST BIOSCIENCES LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-10,12-15 * paragraphs [0071] , [0 88] - [0156] - [ 274] , [ 290] , [ 342] , [ 344] , [ 349] , [ 361] , [ 387] - [0410] * * in particular * * paragraphs [0148] - [0156] * * Examples * * Claims *; | [X]EP1849460 (ALZA CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0187] * * Examples * * Claims, in particular * * claims 11, 68 *; | [X]WO2008027442 (THERAQUEST BIOSCIENCES LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-10,12-15 * paragraphs [0052] , [ 211] , [ 335] , [ 383] - [0421] * * in particular * * paragraph [0419] * * Examples * * Claims * | International search | [X]US2008026052 (SCHOENHARD GRANT L [US]); | [Y]US7270830 (REIDENBERG BRUCE E [US], et al); | [A]US2003198675 (REDER ROBERT F [US], et al); | [A]US2005075361 (WANG JHI-JOUNG [TW]) | Examination | CA2126611 | EP0631781 | US2002010127 | WO02100382 | WO2007013975 |