EP2292523 - MECHANISM FOR ASSISTING OPENING AND CLOSING OF SCREW CAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Michiwaki, Hiroshi 201 Sunheights Kamiyama 2-15, Kanayamacho 1-chome Higashikurume-shi Tokyo 203-0003 / JP | [2011/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/10] | Representative(s) | Stöckeler, Ferdinand, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/10] | Stöckeler, Ferdinand, et al Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler, Zinkler & Partner Postfach 246 82043 Pullach / DE | Application number, filing date | 09719780.0 | 16.03.2009 | [2011/10] | WO2009JP01163 | Priority number, date | JP20080065004 | 14.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008065004 | [2011/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009113321 | Date: | 17.09.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2292523 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.09.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65D41/04, B67B7/18 | [2011/10] | CPC: |
B67B7/18 (EP,KR,US);
B65D41/0485 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/10] | Title | German: | MECHANISMUS ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG DES ÖFFNENS UND SCHLIESSENS EINES SCHRAUBVERSCHLUSSES | [2011/10] | English: | MECHANISM FOR ASSISTING OPENING AND CLOSING OF SCREW CAP | [2011/10] | French: | MÉCANISME D'AIDER À L'OUVERTURE ET À LA FERMETURE D'UNE CAPSULE À VIS | [2011/10] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2010 | Translation filed | 13.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/10] | 29.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/10] | 29.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2792304 (HUDELOT ROMAIN [FR]) [X] 1,3,8-10,15 * page 3, line 41 - line 48; figure 7 *; | [X]GB191013029 (COX GEORGE WRIGHT) [X] 1,3,8-10 * page 3, line 12 - line 34; figures 7,8 *; | [X]JPH0811920 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1,3,8-10 * abstract *; | [A]WO2007074953 (SHIN JAE-MIN [KR]) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [X]FR2792304 (HUDELOT ROMAIN [FR]); | [Y]JP2002037387 (AMANO AKIRA); | [Y]CA2290873 (PUZZELLA GIUSEPPE [CA]); | [Y]GB469486 (DAVENPORTS C B LTD, et al); | [Y]JP2004168406 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2006182357 | JPH0348082 |