EP2252187 - FOOD PROCESSOR OPERATED BY AN ELECTRIC MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/47] | FOOD PROCESSOR OPERATED BY AN ELECTRIC MOTOR | ||
[2014/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vorwerk & Co. Interholding GmbH Mühlenweg 17-37 42275 Wuppertal / DE | [2010/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFFMANN, Sara Kreuzstrasse 6 51702 Bergneustadt / DE | 02 /
SCHOMACHER, Jutta Bausenhaus 5 42489 Wülfrath / DE | 03 /
ARNOLD, Hans-Peter Thingslindestraße 93 58566 Kierspe / DE | [2010/47] | Representative(s) | Müller, Enno, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | Müller, Enno, et al Rieder & Partner Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Corneliusstrasse 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [2010/47] | Müller, Enno, et al RIEDER & PARTNER Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Corneliusstrasse 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 09719864.2 | 25.02.2009 | [2014/44] | WO2009EP52212 | Priority number, date | DE20081013863 | 12.03.2008 Original published format: DE102008013863 | [2010/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009112364 | Date: | 17.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2252187 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2252187 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A47J43/25, B26D3/22 | [2010/47] | CPC: |
A47J43/255 (EP);
B26D3/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/47] | Title | German: | ELEKTROMOTORISCH BETRIEBENE KÜCHENMASCHINE | [2014/44] | English: | FOOD PROCESSOR OPERATED BY AN ELECTRIC MOTOR | [2014/44] | French: | MACHINE DE CUISINE ÉLECTROMOTORISÉE | [2014/44] |
Former [2010/47] | ELEKTROMOTORISCH BETRIEBENE KÜCHENMASCHINE | ||
Former [2010/47] | FOOD PROCESSOR OPERATED BY AN ELECTRIC MOTOR | ||
Former [2010/47] | MACHINE DE CUISINE ÉLECTROMOTORISÉE | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/47] | 23.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 18.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP13162718.4 / EP2628424 | EP13162719.2 / EP2628425 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.02.2009 | BG | 29.10.2014 | CY | 29.10.2014 | CZ | 29.10.2014 | DK | 29.10.2014 | EE | 29.10.2014 | FI | 29.10.2014 | HR | 29.10.2014 | LT | 29.10.2014 | LV | 29.10.2014 | MC | 29.10.2014 | MK | 29.10.2014 | MT | 29.10.2014 | NL | 29.10.2014 | RO | 29.10.2014 | SE | 29.10.2014 | SI | 29.10.2014 | SK | 29.10.2014 | TR | 29.10.2014 | NO | 29.01.2015 | GR | 30.01.2015 | AT | 25.02.2015 | GB | 25.02.2015 | IE | 25.02.2015 | LU | 25.02.2015 | BE | 28.02.2015 | CH | 28.02.2015 | IS | 28.02.2015 | LI | 28.02.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 25.02.2009 | |
BG | 29.10.2014 | ||
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
MT | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
TR | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
AT | 25.02.2015 | ||
GB | 25.02.2015 | ||
IE | 25.02.2015 | ||
LU | 25.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
MT | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
AT | 25.02.2015 | ||
GB | 25.02.2015 | ||
IE | 25.02.2015 | ||
LU | 25.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
AT | 25.02.2015 | ||
GB | 25.02.2015 | ||
IE | 25.02.2015 | ||
LU | 25.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
GB | 25.02.2015 | ||
IE | 25.02.2015 | ||
LU | 25.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
GB | 25.02.2015 | ||
IE | 25.02.2015 | ||
LU | 25.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
LU | 25.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
LU | 25.02.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/44] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
LU | 25.02.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 29.10.2014 | |
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 29.10.2014 | |
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 29.10.2014 | |
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 29.10.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XA]FR2109123 (DITO ETU RECH DIFFUSI) [X] 1,8-13 * page 4, line 20 - page 6, line 17 * * page 6, line 38 - page 7, line 20; figures 1-7 * [A] 3-7,14,15; | [X]FR2144972 (FERBLANTERIE STE INDLE) [X] 2,8-13 * page 2, line 34 - page 4, line 9; figures 1-4 *; | [DA]WO03075727 (VORWERK & CO ELEKTROWERKE KG [DE], et al) [DA] * the whole document * | by applicant | DE1265364 | FR2109123 | FR2144972 |