EP2251925 - Method of recycling fuel cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/46] | FILM ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY | ||
[2012/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2013 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/46] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAGAWA, Takashi c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
TERANISHI, Masatoshi c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2012/27] |
Former [2010/46] | 01 /
NAKAGAWA, Takashi c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
02 /
TERANISHI, Masatoshi c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/27] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/46] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09720052.1 | 12.02.2009 | [2010/46] | WO2009JP00557 | Priority number, date | JP20080061178 | 11.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008061178 | JP20080061177 | 11.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008061177 | JP20080061176 | 11.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008061176 | JP20080061175 | 11.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008061175 | [2010/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009113240 | Date: | 17.09.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2251925 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2251925 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.09.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/02, H01M8/10, H01M8/00 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
H01M4/92 (EP,US);
H01M8/008 (EP,US);
H01M8/02 (EP,US);
H01M8/0247 (EP,US);
H01M8/0267 (EP);
H01M8/1004 (EP,US);
H01M8/2483 (EP);
H01M8/1023 (EP,US);
H01M8/1039 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/16] | H01M8/02, H01M8/10 | ||
Former IPC [2010/46] | H01M8/04, H01M8/02, H01M8/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Verwerten von Brennstoffzellen | [2012/04] | English: | Method of recycling fuel cells | [2012/04] | French: | Procédé de recyclage de piles à combustible | [2012/04] |
Former [2010/46] | FILMELEKTRODENANORDNUNG | ||
Former [2010/46] | FILM ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY | ||
Former [2010/46] | ENSEMBLE FILM-ÉLECTRODE | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2010 | Translation filed | 26.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2010 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/46] | 14.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.02.2009 | AT | 04.07.2012 | BE | 04.07.2012 | CY | 04.07.2012 | CZ | 04.07.2012 | DK | 04.07.2012 | EE | 04.07.2012 | FI | 04.07.2012 | HR | 04.07.2012 | IT | 04.07.2012 | LT | 04.07.2012 | LV | 04.07.2012 | MK | 04.07.2012 | MT | 04.07.2012 | NL | 04.07.2012 | PL | 04.07.2012 | RO | 04.07.2012 | SE | 04.07.2012 | SI | 04.07.2012 | SK | 04.07.2012 | TR | 04.07.2012 | BG | 04.10.2012 | NO | 04.10.2012 | GR | 05.10.2012 | ES | 15.10.2012 | IS | 04.11.2012 | PT | 05.11.2012 | IE | 12.02.2013 | LU | 12.02.2013 | CH | 28.02.2013 | FR | 28.02.2013 | LI | 28.02.2013 | MC | 28.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
HR | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
MK | 04.07.2012 | ||
MT | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
TR | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
NO | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
IE | 12.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
FR | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
HR | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
MT | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
NO | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
IE | 12.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
FR | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
HR | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
NO | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
IE | 12.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
FR | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
HR | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
NO | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
HR | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
NO | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
HR | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
NO | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
HR | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
HR | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
HR | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
HR | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
HR | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
HR | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
HR | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
HR | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | SI | 04.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2007179809 (JAPAN GORE TEX INC) [X] 2,3,5-7 * abstract * [I] 4; | [XI]WO2004091024 (UMICORE AG & CO KG [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,5-7 * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 4, line 19 - line 31 * * page 6, line 28 - page 7, line 5 * [I] 4; | [XI]US2006127716 (LEHMANN MIRKO [DE]) [X] 1,6 * paragraphs [0033] - [0036] - [0 41] - [0045]; figures 1,2 * [I] 3,4; | [XI]EP1643577 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,5-7 * paragraph [0028]; figures 2,3 * [I] 3,4; | [XI]US2002192537 (REN XIAOMING [US]) [X] 1,5-7 * paragraphs [0045] , [0 58] , [0 59]; figures 3A-F * [I] 3,4; | [XPI]WO2008050611 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [XP] 2,3,5-7 * paragraphs [0060] , [0061]; figure 1 * [I] 4; | [XPI]US2008063918 (KAJIO KATSUHIRO [JP]) [XP] 1-3,5-7 * paragraphs [0056] , [0 57] , [0 63] - [0068]; figures 12,16 * [I] 4; | [A]JP2003119078 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | International search | [X]WO2006112402 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2004319461 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2007250249 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP2004179124 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP2004214133 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2006207003 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [XP]JP2008066118 (AISIN SEIKI, et al); | [A]JP2006277965 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [A]JP2003115319 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) | by applicant | JP2003115319 | JP2006207003 | JP2007515050 | US2005136301 | JPS63161129 | JP2007083173 | JP2006095367 | JP2002025581 | JP2008061175 | JP2008061176 | JP2008061177 | JP2008061178 |