EP2258811 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING POROUS CERAMICS AND MULTIPHASIC MATERIALS FROM CELLULOSIC PRECURSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2013 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universidad de Sevilla OTRI - Universidad de Sevilla Pabellón de Brasil Paseo de las Delicias s/n 41013 Sevilla / ES | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTÍNEZ FERNÁNDEZ, Julián Dpto. Física de la Materia Condensada Facultad de Física Avda. Reina Mercedes s/n E-41012 Sevilla / ES | 02 /
RAMÍREZ DE ARELLANO LÓPEZ, Antonio Dpto. Física de la Materia Condensada Facultad de Física Avda. Reina Mercedes s/n E-41012 Sevilla / ES | 03 /
VARELA FERIA, Francisco Dpto. Física de la Materia Condensada Facultad de Física Avda. Reina Mercedes s/n E-41012 Sevilla / ES | [2010/49] | Representative(s) | Temiño Ceniceros, Ignacio Abril Patentes y Marcas, S.L. Calle Zurbano, 76 - 7° 28010 Madrid / ES | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 09720793.0 | 12.03.2009 | [2010/49] | WO2009ES00139 | Priority number, date | ES20080000743 | 14.03.2008 Original published format: ES 200800743 | [2010/49] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009112619 | Date: | 17.09.2009 | Language: | ES | [2009/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2258811 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 17.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C10B53/02, C04B35/56, C04B35/565, C01B31/30, C01B31/36 | CPC: |
C04B35/524 (EP);
C04B35/573 (EP);
C04B35/62209 (EP);
C04B38/0032 (EP);
C10B53/02 (EP,US);
C22C1/1036 (EP);
B22F2998/00 (EP);
B22F2999/00 (EP);
C04B2111/20 (EP);
C04B2235/40 (EP);
C04B2235/401 (EP);
C04B2235/404 (EP);
C04B2235/405 (EP);
C04B2235/407 (EP);
C04B2235/428 (EP);
C04B2235/48 (EP);
C04B2235/606 (EP);
C04B2235/6562 (EP);
C04B2235/6565 (EP);
C04B2235/6584 (EP);
C04B2235/728 (EP);
Y02E50/10 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B38/0032, C04B35/565, C04B38/0054, C04B38/0074 (EP);
B22F2998/00, C22C29/00 (EP);
B22F2999/00, C22C1/08, B22F3/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/49] | Title | German: | SYSTEME ZUR CHIRURGISCHEN ENFERNUNG VON GEWEBE | [2010/49] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING POROUS CERAMICS AND MULTIPHASIC MATERIALS FROM CELLULOSIC PRECURSORS | [2010/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CÉRAMIQUES POREUSES ET DE MATÉRIAUX À PHASES MULTIPLES À PARTIR DE PRÉCURSEURS CELLULOSIQUES | [2010/49] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2010 | Translation filed | 07.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 07.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/49] | 06.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 31.03.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A] - WANG T-C ET AL., "Fabrication and the wear behaviors of the carbon/aluminum composites based on wood templates.", CARBON, (2006), vol. 44, no. 5PG, pages 900 - 906, XP025010967 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carbon.2005.10.022 | [A] - WANG T-C ET AL., "Preparation and thermal properties of metal matrix composites with wood- structure.", MATERIALS&DESIGN, (2008), vol. 29, no. 6, pages 1275 - 1279, XP022546659 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.matdes.2007.05.006 | by applicant | ES200483 | - W. D. KINGERY, "Social needs and ceramic technology", AM. CERAM. SOC. BULL., (1980), vol. 59, no. 6, pages 598 - 600 | - H. B. STROCK, SPECTRUM MATERIALS MANUFACTURING, (1992), vol. 35, pages 1 - 11 | - "Silicon Carbide 87", J. D. CAWLEY; C. E. SEMLER, Ceramic Transations, AMERICAN CERAMICS SOCIETY, (1987), vol. 2 | - S. J. DAPKUNAS, "Ceramics Heat Exchangers", AM. CERAM. SOC. BULL., (1988), vol. 67, no. 2, pages 388 - 91 | - "Properties and applications of SiC ceramics", K. YAMADA; M. MORI, Silicon carbide ceramics, ELSEVIER APPLIED SCIENCE, (1991), pages 13 - 44 | - R. NASLAIN, "Materials design and processing of high temperature matrix composites: state of the art and future trends", ADV. COMPOSITE MATER, (1999), vol. 8, no. 1, pages 3 - 16 | - "The role of boron and carbon in the sintering of silicon carbide", S. PROCHAZCA, Special Ceramics, BRITISH CERAMICS RESEARCH ASSOCIATION, (1975), vol. 6, pages 171 - 81 | - G. TRANTINA, "Design techniques for ceramics in fusion reactors", NUCL. ENG. DES., (1979), vol. 54, no. 1, pages 676 - 677 | - C. GRESKOVIC; J. H. ROSOLOWSKI, "Sintering of covalent solids", J. AM. CERAM. SOC, (1976), vol. 59, no. 7-8, pages 336 - 43 | - W. BOCKER; H. HAUSNER, "Observations on the sintering characteristic of submicrom silicon carbide powders", SCIENCE OF CERAMICS, (1977), vol. 9, pages 168 - 75 | - "Properties and applications of SiC ceramics", H. TANAKA, Silicon carbide ceramics, ELSEVIER APPLIED SCIENCE, (1991), pages 213 - 238 | - R. A. ALLIEGRO; L. B. COFFIN; J. R. TINKLEPAUGHT, J. AM. CERAM. SOC., (1956), vol. 39, page 386 | - "Properties and applications of SiC ceramics", T. HIRAI; M. SASAKI, Silicon carbide ceramics, ELSEVIER APPLIED SCIENCE, (1991), pages 77 - 98 | - T HIRAI; H. ASAKURA; M SASAKI, BULL. JAPAN INST. MET, (1987), vol. 26, page 809 | - C. FORREST; P. KENEDY; J. SHENNAN, "The fabrications and properties of self- bonded silicon carbide", SPECIAL CERAMICS, (1972), vol. 5, pages 99 - 123 | - O. CHAKRABATI; S. GHOSH; J. MUKERJI, "Influence of grain size, free silicon content and temperature in the strength and toughness of reaction bonded silicon carbide", CERAMICS INTERNATIONAL, (1991), vol. 5, no. 2, pages 118 - 123 | - B. JOHN; J. WACHTMAN, Structural Ceramics, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1989), vol. 29, pages 91 - 163 | - HOCKEY B.J.; WIEDERHORN S.M., "Effect of microstructure on the creep of siliconized silicon carbide", J. AM. CERAM. SOC., (1992), vol. 75, no. 7, pages 1822 - 30 | - SHELDON M. WIEDERHORN; B. J. HOCKEY; J. D. FRENCH, "Mechanisms of deformation of silicon nitride and silicon carbide at high temperatures", J. EUROPEAN CERAMIC SOCIETY, (1999), vol. 19, no. 13-14, pages 2273 - 2284 | - SINGH M; BEHRENDT DR, "Reactive melt infiltration of silicon-niobium alloys in microporous carbon", J. MATER. RES., (1994), vol. 9, page 1701 | - SINGH M; BEHRENDT DR., "Reactive melt infiltration of silicon-molybdenum alloys in microporous carbon", MATER. SCI. AND ENG., (1995), vol. A194, page 193 | - SINGH M; BEHRENDT DR, "Microstructure and mechanical properties of reaction-formed silicon carbide (RFSC) ceramics", MATER. SCI. AND ENG., (1994), vol. A187, page 183 | - MUNOZ A; MARTINEZ FERNáNDEZ J; DOMINGUEZ RODRIGUEZ A; SINGH M, "High temperature compressive strength of reaction formed silicon carbide (RFSC) ceramics", J. EUROP. CERAM. SOC., (1998), vol. 18, page 65 | - J. MARTINEZ-FEMANDEZ; F.M. VALERA-FERIA; M. SINGH, "Microstructure and thermomechanical characterizacion of bimorphic silicon carbide-based ceramics", SCRIPTA MATERIALIA, (2000), vol. 43, pages 813 - 818 | - "Microstructure and thermomechanical characterizacion of bimorphic silicon carbide-based ceramics, Environment Conscious Materials", MARTíNEZ-FERNáNDEZ J.; VALERA-FERIA F. M.; DOMINGUEZ RODRIGUEZ A.; SINGH M., Ecomaterials., CANADIAN INSTITUTE OF MINING, METALLURGY, AND PETROLEUM, (2000), pages 733 - 740 | - F.M. VARELA-FERIA; J. MARTíNEZ-FERNáNDEZ; A.R. DE ARELLANO-LOPEZ; M. SINGH, "Low Density Biomorphic Silicon Carbide: Microstructure and Mechanical Properties", J. EUROP. CERAM. SOC., (2002), vol. 22, no. 14-15, pages 2719 - 2725 | - M. SINGH; J. MARTINEZ-FEMDNDEZ; A.R. DE ARELLANO-LOPEZ, "Environmentally Conscious Ceramics (Ecoceramics) from Natural Wood Precursors", CURRENT OPINIONS ON SOLID STATE & MATERIAL SCIENCE, (2003), vol. 7, pages 247 - 254 | - Y. KARDASHEV; I. BURENKOV; B.SMIRNOV; A.R.DE ARELLANO-L6PEZ; J. MARTINEZ-FERNANDEZ; F.M. VARELA-FERIA, "Elasticity and Inelasticity of Biomorphic Silicon Carbide Ceramics", PHYSICS OF THE SOLID STATE, (2004), vol. 46, no. 10, pages 1873 - 1877 | - T.S. ORLOVA; B.I. SMIRNOV; A.R. DE ARELLANO LOPEZ; J. MARTINEZ FERNáNDEZ; R. SEPúLVEDA, "Anisotropy of electric resistivity of Sapele-based biomorphic SiC/Si composites", PHYSICS OF THE SOLID STATE, (2005), vol. 47, no. 2, pages 220 - 223 | - L. S. PARFEN'EVA; B. I. SMIRNOV; I. A. SMIRNOV; H. MISIOREK; J. MUCHA; A. JEZOWSKI; A. R. DE ARELLANO-LOPEZ; J. MARTINEZ-FEMANDEZ;, "Thermal Conductivity of Bio-SiC and the Si Embedded in Cellular Pores of the SiC/Si Biomorphic Composite", PHYSICS OF THE SOLID STATE, (2007), vol. 49, no. 2, pages 211 - 214 | - T. S. ORLOVA; D. V. IL'IN; B. I. SMIRNOV; I. A. SMIRNOV; R. SEPULVEDA; J. MARTINEZ-FEMANDEZ; A. R. DE ARELLANO-LOPEZ, "Electrical Properties of Bio-SiC and Si Components of the SiC/Si Biomorphic Composite", PHYSICS OF THE SOLID STATE, (2007), vol. 49, no. 2, pages 205 - 210 | - I. A. SMIRNOV; B. I. SMIRNOV; H. MISIOREK; A. JEZOWSKI; A. R. DE ARELLANO-LOPEZ; J. MARTINEZ-FEMANDEZ; F. M. VARELA-FERIA; A. I. K, HEAT CAPACITY AND VELOCITY OF SOUND IN THE SIC/SI BIOMORPHIC COMPOSITE PHYSICS OF THE SOLID STATE, (2007), vol. 49, no. 10, pages 1839 - 1844 | - I. A. SMIRNOV; B. I. SMIRNOV; A. I. KRIVCHIKOV; H. MISIOREK; A. JEZOWSKI; A. R. DE ARELLANO-LOPEZ; J. MARTINEZ-FERNANDEZ; R. SEPUL, HEAT CAPACITY OF SILICON CARBIDE AT LOW TEMPERATURESPHYSICS OF THE SOLID STATE, (2007), vol. 49, no. 2, pages 1835 - 1838 | - J. MARTINEZ FERNANDEZ; A. MUNOZ; A. R. DE ARELLANO LOPEZ; F. M. VALERA FERIA; A. DOMINGUEZ-RODRIGUEZ; M. SINGH, "Microstructure-mechanical property correlation in siliconized silicon carbide ceramics", ACTA MATERIALIA, (2003), vol. 51, no. 11, pages 3259 - 3275 | - A.R. DE ARELLANO-LóPEZ; J. MARTíNEZ-FERNáNDEZ; P. GONZáLEZ; C. DOMINGUEZ; V. FERNáNDEZ-QUERO; M. SINGH, "Biomorphic sic: a new engineered ceramic material", INT. JOURNAL OF APPLIED CERAMIC TECHNOLOGY, (2004), vol. 1, pages 95 - 100 | ES20010002278 |