EP2254685 - A SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ENHANCED REMOVAL OF CO2 FROM A MIXED GAS STREAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | For all designated states Alstom Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANDAGAMA, Nareshkumar, B. 1131 Edbury Drive Knoxville TN 37922 / US | 02 /
LIU, Zheng 11615 Laneborough Way 608 Knoxville TN 37934 / US | [2010/48] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2013/39] |
Former [2010/48] | Simonsson, Erik Awapatent AB P.O. Box 99 351 04 Växjö / SE | Application number, filing date | 09721629.5 | 19.03.2009 | [2010/48] | WO2009US37618 | Priority number, date | US20080038494 | 21.03.2008 Original published format: US 38494 | US20090406360 | 18.03.2009 Original published format: US 406360 | [2010/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009117550 | Date: | 24.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2254685 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/62 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
B01D53/1475 (EP,US);
B01D53/1493 (EP,US);
B01D53/62 (EP,US);
B01D2257/504 (EP,US);
Y02A50/20 (EP,US);
Y02C20/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/48] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERSTÄRKTEN ENTFERNUNG VON CO2 AUS EINEM MISCHGASSTROM | [2010/48] | English: | A SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ENHANCED REMOVAL OF CO2 FROM A MIXED GAS STREAM | [2010/48] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR UNE SUPPRESSION AMÉLIORÉE DE CO<SB>2</SB>À PARTIR D'UN FLUX GAZEUX MIXTE | [2010/48] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/48] | 09.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/23] | 29.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.07.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]SU762943 ; | [A]US3932582 (EICKMEYER ALLEN G) [A] * the whole document *; | [X]US5137702 (YAN TSOUNG Y [US]) [X] 6-9,13 * column 5, line 42 - column 6, line 29; figure 1; claim - *; | [X]US2006213224 (FRADETTE SYLVIE [CA], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 2, paragraphs 32,32 * * page 3, paragraph 47; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2008021700 (UNIV SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A] - XU X ET AL, "Preparation and characterization of novel CO2 ''molecular basket'' adsorbents based on polymer-modified mesoporous molecular sieve MCM-41", MICROPOROUS AND MESOPOROUS MATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHING, NEW YORK, US, (20030814), vol. 62, no. 1-2, ISSN 1387-1811, pages 29 - 45, XP004441132 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1387-1811(03)00388-3 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1981, no. 21, Database accession no. 1981-37745D, XP002534493 & SU762943 B 19800915 (VNIPIGAZ NATUR GAS) | Examination | WO2006089423 |