EP2268551 - ANTI-SHOCK PACKAGING IN PARTICULAR FOR BEVERAGE DISPENSERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [2011/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TARCSAY, Maria Katharina Bäulistrasse 53 CH-8049 Zurich / CH | 02 /
HODEL, Thomas Rebenweid 23 CH-6332 Hagendorn / CH | [2011/01] | Representative(s) | Schnyder, Frank Simon Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/27] | Schnyder, Frank Simon Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | ||
Former [2011/01] | Schnyder, Frank Simon Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 09722097.4 | 11.03.2009 | [2011/01] | WO2009EP52833 | Priority number, date | EP20080153117 | 20.03.2008 Original published format: EP 08153117 | [2011/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009115438 | Date: | 24.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2268551 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2268551 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/50, B65D81/07 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
B65D81/075 (EP);
B65D5/5028 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/01] | Title | German: | STOSSSICHERE VERPACKUNG, INSBESONDERE FÜR GETRÄNKESPENDER | [2011/01] | English: | ANTI-SHOCK PACKAGING IN PARTICULAR FOR BEVERAGE DISPENSERS | [2011/01] | French: | CONDITIONNEMENT ANTICHOC DESTINÉ EN PARTICULIER À DES DISTRIBUTEURS DE BOISSONS | [2011/01] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 13.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.03.2009 | CY | 04.07.2012 | CZ | 04.07.2012 | DK | 04.07.2012 | EE | 04.07.2012 | FI | 04.07.2012 | HR | 04.07.2012 | LT | 04.07.2012 | LV | 04.07.2012 | MK | 04.07.2012 | MT | 04.07.2012 | PL | 04.07.2012 | RO | 04.07.2012 | SE | 04.07.2012 | SI | 04.07.2012 | SK | 04.07.2012 | BG | 04.10.2012 | GR | 05.10.2012 | IS | 04.11.2012 | IE | 11.03.2013 | LU | 11.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 04.07.2012 | |
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
HR | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
MK | 04.07.2012 | ||
MT | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
IE | 11.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | CY | 04.07.2012 | |
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
HR | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
MT | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
IE | 11.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | CY | 04.07.2012 | |
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
HR | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
IE | 11.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | CY | 04.07.2012 | |
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
HR | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 04.07.2012 | |
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
HR | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 04.07.2012 | |
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
HR | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 04.07.2012 | |
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
HR | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 04.07.2012 | |
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
HR | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 04.07.2012 | |
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
HR | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 04.07.2012 | |
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
HR | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 04.07.2012 | |
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
HR | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 04.07.2012 | |
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 04.07.2012 | |
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | SI | 04.07.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2774973 (C G L THERMOFORMAGE [FR]) [X] 1-4,6-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US6889839 (ROSTEN DAVID [US] ET AL) [X] 1-4,6-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US2006042995 (MCGRATH MICHAEL T [US] ET AL) [X] 1-4,7-10 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO2008129910 (YAMATO PACKING TECHNOLOGY INST [JP]; KASIWABARA KOUICHI [JP]) [PX] 1-4,7-10 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0814032 (ADE INC [US]) [X] 1-4,7-10 * the whole document *; | [PX]EP1925567 (ADRIANO CALLEGARI LTD [CH]) [PX] 1-4,7-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US2007284281 (SHIMAZU NAOHIRO [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-4,7-10 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH07237667 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD; MITSUGI SANGYO KK) [X] 1-4,7-10 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9306701 (BRADFORD CO [US]) [X] 1-4,7-10 * figure 2 * |