EP2274123 - METALLIC NANOPARTICLES STABILISED WITH DERIVATISIED POLYETHYLENIMINES OR POLYVINYLAMINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/03] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2011/03] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUINSTRA, Gerrit Oortskamp 12 22523 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
SCHROF, Wolfgang In den Schelmenaeckern 38 67271 Neuleiningen / DE | 03 /
GOEDERT, Udo Tiefenthaler Str. 12 67280 Ebertsheim / DE | 04 /
FEUERHAKE, Robert Rheindamm Str. 56 68163 Mannheim / DE | 05 /
KOPLIN, Tobias Joachim Eschenbachstr. 40 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | 06 /
DOMKE, Imme Werderstrasse 6 68165 Mannheim / DE | [2011/03] | Representative(s) | Schuck, Alexander Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/03] | Schuck, Alexander Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 09722099.0 | 17.03.2009 | [2011/03] | WO2009EP53114 | Priority number, date | EP20080152996 | 19.03.2008 Original published format: EP 08152996 | [2011/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009115506 | Date: | 24.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2274123 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B22F9/24, C09C1/62, C01G3/00, C01G5/00, C01G7/00, C01G9/00, C01G29/00, C01G55/00 | [2011/03] | CPC: |
C09C1/62 (EP,US);
B22F1/054 (EP,US);
B22F1/10 (EP,US);
B22F9/24 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C01G29/00 (EP,US);
C01G3/00 (EP,US);
C01G5/00 (EP,US);
C01G55/00 (EP,US);
C01G7/00 (EP,US);
C01G9/00 (EP,US);
C01P2002/01 (EP,US);
C01P2002/84 (EP,US);
C01P2004/04 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
C01P2006/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/03] | Title | German: | MIT DERIVATISIERTEN POLYETHYLENIMINEN ODER POLYVINYLAMINEN STABILISIERTE METALL-NANOPARTIKEL | [2011/03] | English: | METALLIC NANOPARTICLES STABILISED WITH DERIVATISIED POLYETHYLENIMINES OR POLYVINYLAMINES | [2011/03] | French: | NANOPARTICULES MÉTALLIQUES STABILISÉES AVEC DES POLYÉTHYLÈNE IMINES OU DES POLYVINYLE AMINES DÉRIVÉES | [2011/03] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/03] | 21.10.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2004234604 (MECKING STEFAN [DE], et al) [X] 1-9,13 * paragraphs [0008] - [0045] ** figure 1 *; | [XD]DE102006017696 (BAYER TECHNOLOGY SERVICES GMBH [DE]) [XD] 1,4-14 * examples 1-11 * * paragraphs [0014] , [0037] , [0041] , [0042] , [0046] *; | [X] - KRÄMER M ET AL, "Water-soluble dendritic architectures with carbohydrate shells for the templation and stabilization of catalytically active metal nanoparticles", MACROMOLECULES, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20050101), vol. 38, ISSN 0024-9297, pages 8308 - 8315, XP002441581 [X] 1-14 * page 8308, column 2 - page 8314 * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma0510791 | [XD] - LIANG ET AL, "Preparation of platinum nanoparticles in salt-induced micelles of dumbbell-shaped ABA copolymer", JOURNAL OF COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCIENCE, ACADEMIC PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20060215), vol. 294, no. 2, ISSN 0021-9797, pages 371 - 375, XP005166595 [XD] 1-8,12-14 * page 371, column 2 - page 375 * * figures 1,5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jcis.2005.07.028 |