EP2265583 - SPIROINDOLINONE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/52] | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Jin-Jun 50 Highmount Avenue Warren New Jersey 07059 / US | [2010/52] | Representative(s) | Klein, Thomas F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/41] | Klein, Thomas F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2010/52] | Klein, Thomas F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 09722134.5 | 09.03.2009 | [2010/52] | WO2009EP52737 | Priority number, date | US20080037799 | 19.03.2008 Original published format: US 37799 | [2010/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009115425 | Date: | 24.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2265583 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2265583 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/96 | [2010/52] | CPC: |
C07D413/04 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07D209/96 (EP,US);
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
C07D405/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/52] | Title | German: | SPIROINDOLINON-DERIVATE | [2010/52] | English: | SPIROINDOLINONE DERIVATIVES | [2010/52] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE SPIROINDOLINONE | [2010/52] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/52] | 23.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.03.2009 | AT | 12.10.2011 | BE | 12.10.2011 | CY | 12.10.2011 | CZ | 12.10.2011 | DK | 12.10.2011 | EE | 12.10.2011 | FI | 12.10.2011 | HR | 12.10.2011 | LT | 12.10.2011 | LV | 12.10.2011 | MK | 12.10.2011 | MT | 12.10.2011 | NL | 12.10.2011 | PL | 12.10.2011 | RO | 12.10.2011 | SE | 12.10.2011 | SI | 12.10.2011 | SK | 12.10.2011 | TR | 12.10.2011 | BG | 12.01.2012 | NO | 12.01.2012 | GR | 13.01.2012 | IS | 12.02.2012 | PT | 13.02.2012 | IE | 09.03.2012 | LU | 09.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
MK | 12.10.2011 | ||
MT | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
TR | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
IE | 09.03.2012 | ||
LU | 09.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
MK | 12.10.2011 | ||
MT | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
TR | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
IE | 09.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
MK | 12.10.2011 | ||
MT | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
IE | 09.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
MK | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
IE | 09.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
MK | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
IE | 09.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
IE | 09.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 12.10.2011 | |
NO | 12.01.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9715556 (SANOFI SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 3, line 5 - page 5, line 6; compound 3 * * page 25, line 14 - page 27, line 7 * * claims 16-18 *; | [PA]WO2008055812 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [PA] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A] - ASHIMORI A,. OVERMAN L., JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (20020501), vol. 57, no. 17, pages 4571 - 4572, XP002527583 [A] 1-11 * p.4571 scheme 2 compound 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00043a005 | [A] - ASHIMORI A ET AL, "CATALYTIC ASYMMETRIC SYNTHESIS OF QUATERNARY CARBON CENTERS. EXPLORATORY INVESTIGATIONS OF INTRAMOLECULAR HECK REACTIONS OF (E)-ALPHA,BETA-UNSATURATED 2-HALOANILIDES AND ANALOGUES TO FORM ENANTIEONRICHED SPIROCYCLIC PRODUCTS", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC., US, (19980708), vol. 120, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 6477 - 6487, XP001038246 [A] 1-11 * p.6480 scheme 3 * * page 6482; compound 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja980786p | [A] - JOHNSON R S ET AL, "The Alkaloids of Gelsenium sempervirens. Part IV. Derivatives of pyridine, isoquinoline, and indol-2(3H)-one as possible initial materials for synthesis of Gelsemine", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANSACTIONS 1, CHEMICAL SOCIETY. LETCHWORTH, GB, (19000101), ISSN 0300-922X, pages 796 - 800, XP002156747 [A] 1-11 * page 797; compound XIV * | [A] - DING KE ET AL, "Structure-based design of potent non-peptide MDM2 inhibitors.", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY 27 JUL 2005, (20050727), vol. 127, no. 29, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 10130 - 10131, XP002527584 [A] 1-11 * page 10131; compounds 1A-1F * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JA051147Z |