EP2263262 - PHOTOVOLTAIC CELL AND METHODS FOR PRODUCING A PHOTOVOLTAIC CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2015 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | 08.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oerlikon Solar AG, Trübbach Hauptstrasse 1A 4977 Trübbach / CH | For all designated states Fyzikální ústav AV CR, v.v.i. Na Slovance 2 18221 Praha 8 / CZ | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | For all designated states Oerlikon Solar AG, Trübbach Hauptstrasse 1A 4977 Trübbach / CH | ||
For all designated states Fyzikalni Ustav Av Cr, V. V. I. Na Slovance 2 18221 Praha 8 / CZ | |||
Former [2010/51] | For all designated states Oerlikon Trading AG, Trübbach Hauptstrasse 1A 9477 Trübbach / CH | ||
For all designated states Fyzikalni Ustav Av Cr, V. V. I. Na Slovance 2 18221 Praha 8 / CZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANECEK, Milan Darwinova 976/6 14300 Praha 4-modrany / CZ | 02 /
MEIER, Johannes Chemin Des Vignes 3 2035 Corcelles / CH | 03 /
KROLL, Ulrich Le Fornel 7 2035 Corcelles / CH | [2010/51] | Representative(s) | Moore, Joanne Camilla Schweiger & Partners Karlstrasse 35 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/51] | Moore, Joanne Camilla Schweiger & Partner Karlstrasse 35 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09722751.6 | 20.03.2009 | [2010/51] | WO2009IB51186 | Priority number, date | US20080038553 | 21.03.2008 Original published format: US 38553 | US20090154160 | 20.02.2009 Original published format: US 154160 | [2010/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009116018 | Date: | 24.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2263262 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0236 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
H01L31/03529 (EP,US);
H01L31/022466 (EP,US);
H01L31/022483 (EP);
H01L31/02366 (EP,US);
H01L31/03921 (EP,US);
H01L31/076 (EP,US);
Y02E10/548 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/51] | Title | German: | PHOTOVOLTAIKZELLE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER PHOTOVOLTAIKZELLE | [2010/51] | English: | PHOTOVOLTAIC CELL AND METHODS FOR PRODUCING A PHOTOVOLTAIC CELL | [2010/51] | French: | CELLULE PHOTOVOLTAÏQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D UNE CELLULE PHOTOVOLTAÏQUE | [2010/51] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/06] | 29.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/24] | 04.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.08.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE4315959 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE]) [X] 1,3,6-12,21,24-40 * columns 3-8; figures 1-4 * [I] 23; | [XI]US6420644 (FUKUI ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,13,14,25-40 * columns 3-6; figure 2 * [I] 15-17; | [X]US2005022860 (TOH PENG SENG [SG]) [X] 1,25 * paragraphs [0023] - [0032]; figure 3 *; | [XI]EP0940857 (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [X] 1,13,14,18-20,22,25-40 * paragraphs [0013] - [0015]; figure 1 * [I] 15-17; | [A]US5770463 (NAKAGAWA KATSUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-40 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0028603 (PACIFIC SOLAR PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-40 * the whole document * | Examination | EP1724840 |