EP2265292 - METHOD FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF HOLLOW SPHERES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2013/39] |
Former [2010/52] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOHMER, Marcel, R. c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
CHLON, Caecilia, H., T. c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
SHI, William, T. c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
HALL, Christopher, S. c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2010/52] | Representative(s) | Kroeze, Johannes Antonius Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/52] | Kroeze, Johannes Antonius Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 09723081.7 | 13.03.2009 | [2010/52] | WO2009IB51052 | Priority number, date | EP20080152979 | 19.03.2008 Original published format: EP 08152979 | [2010/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009115967 | Date: | 24.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2265292 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K49/22, A61K41/00, A61K47/48, B01J13/12, A61K9/51 | [2010/52] | CPC: |
A61K49/223 (EP,CN,US);
A61K41/0028 (EP,CN,US);
A61K49/0002 (EP,CN,US);
A61K49/1818 (CN);
A61K9/0009 (CN);
A61K9/5153 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SYNTHESE VON HOHLKUGELN | [2010/52] | English: | METHOD FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF HOLLOW SPHERES | [2010/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA SYNTHÈSE DE SPHÈRES CREUSES | [2010/52] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/52] | 20.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/26] | 12.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2007085990 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,3-12,14 * page 7, line 10 - page 9, line 4 * * example 2 *; | [X]WO2007010442 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-7,9-12,14 * page 7, line 29 - page 9, line 27 * * page 11, lines 3-15 * * page 12, lines 1-10 * * figure 2 * * claim - *; | [X]US2004258761 (WHEATLEY MARGARET A [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,9-12,14 * paragraphs [0024] , [0027] * * example 3 * * claim - *; | [X]EP0458745 (SINT SA [CH]) [X] 1-3,5,7,9,10,12,14 * column 1, lines 1-8 * * column 8, lines 3-9 * * page 7, lines 50-58 * * column 9, lines 2-54 * * example 3 *; | [X]WO9848783 (POINT BIOMEDICAL CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9-12,14 * page 3, lines 21-23 * * page 4, line 29 - page 5, line 1 * * page 5, lines 6-23,30-34 * * page 6, lines 22-32 * * page 7, lines 33-35 * * example 4 *; | [X]WO2006003581 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,3,5-7,9-14 * page 4, line 25 - page 5, line 2 * * page 6, lines 4-25 * * example 8 *; | [DX] - NGOCYEN T LE ET AL, "Development of nanocapsules through the adaptation of polymer microcapsule fabrication method", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE 29TH. ANNUAL NORTHEAST BIOENGINEERING CONFERENCE. NEWARK, NJ, MARCH 22 - 23, 2003; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE ANNUAL NORTHEAST BIOENGINEERING CONFERENCE], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20030322), vol. CONF. 29, ISBN 978-0-7803-7767-7, pages 315 - 316, XP010647875 [DX] 1-3,5,7-10,12,14 * page 315, column 2, section "C. Conversion to nanocapsules" * * page 316, column 1, paragraph LAST * * figure 2 * | [X] - BÖHMER M. ET A, "Polymer-shelled, gas containing capsules for ultrasound mediated drug delivery", 19th International Congress on Acoustics, Madrid 2-7 September 2007, (200709), URL: http://www.sea-acustica.es/WEB_ICA_07/fchrs/papers/ult-16-004.pdf, (20090824), XP002542672 [X] 1,3,5-7,9-12,14 * the whole document * | [PX] - SCHMIDT B J ET AL, "Adhesion and ultrasound-induced delivery from monodisperse microbubbles in a parallel plate flow cell", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE 20081006 ELSEVIER NL, (20081006), vol. 131, no. 1, pages 19 - 26, XP002542689 [PX] 1,3,4,7,9-12,14 * published on line 29 june 2008 * * abstract * * pages 20-21, section 2.3. "Preparation of microbubbles" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2008.06.020 | [A] - GREF R ET AL, "Interfacial and emulsion stabilising properties of amphiphilic water-soluble poly(ethylene glycol)-poly(lactic acid) copolymers for the fabrication of biocompatible nanoparticles", COLLOIDS AND SURFACES. A, PHYSICACHEMICAL AND ENGINEERING ASPECTS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19980101), vol. 143, no. 2/3, ISSN 0927-7757, pages 413 - 420, XP002976885 [A] * page 414, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0927-7757(98)00524-X | by applicant | - LE ET AL., IEEE, PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL NORTHEAST BIOENGINEERING CONFERENCE ISSUE, (20030322), pages 315 - 316 |