EP2267407 - VIBRATORY GYROSCOPE USING PIEZOELECTRIC FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2017 [2017/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Precision Products Co., Ltd. 1-10 Fuso-cho Amagasaki -shi Hyogo 660-0891 / JP | [2010/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEDA, Takashi c/o SUMITOMO PRECISION PRODUCTS Co. Ltd. 1-10 Fuso-cho Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0891 / JP | 02 /
NISHIDA, Hiroshi c/o SUMITOMO PRECISION PRODUCTS Co. Ltd. 1-10 Fuso-cho Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0891 / JP | 03 /
TORAYASHIKI, Osamu c/o SUMITOMO PRECISION PRODUCTS Co. Ltd. 1-10 Fuso-cho Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0891 / JP | 04 /
TAKEMURA, Mitsuhiko c/o SUMITOMO PRECISION PRODUCTS Co. Ltd. 1-10 Fuso-cho Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0891 / JP | 05 /
FUJIMURA, Tsuyoshi c/o SUMITOMO PRECISION PRODUCTS Co. Ltd. 1-10 Fuso-cho Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0891 / JP | 06 /
ARAKI, Ryuta c/o SUMITOMO PRECISION PRODUCTS Co. Ltd. 1-10 Fuso-cho Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0891 / JP | 07 /
MORIGUCHI, Takafumi c/o SUMITOMO PRECISION PRODUCTS Co. Ltd. 1-10 Fuso-cho Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0891 / JP | 08 /
TESHIMA, Nobutaka c/o SUMITOMO PRECISION PRODUCTS Co. Ltd. 1-10 Fuso-cho Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0891 / JP | 09 /
HIRATA, Yasuyuki c/o SUMITOMO PRECISION PRODUCTS Co. Ltd. 1-10 Fuso-cho Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0891 / JP | [2010/52] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/52] | Peckmann, Ralf Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09724536.9 | 20.02.2009 | [2010/52] | WO2009JP52960 | Priority number, date | JP20080077754 | 25.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008077754 | [2010/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009119205 | Date: | 01.10.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2267407 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.10.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01C19/56, G01P9/04, H01L41/08 | [2010/52] | CPC: |
G01C19/5684 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/52] | Title | German: | VIBRATIONSKREISEL MIT PIEZOELEKTRISCHER FOLIE | [2010/52] | English: | VIBRATORY GYROSCOPE USING PIEZOELECTRIC FILM | [2010/52] | French: | GYROSCOPE VIBRATOIRE UTILISANT UN FILM PIÉZOÉLECTRIQUE | [2010/52] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2010 | Translation filed | 11.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 11.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/52] | 24.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/06] | 06.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6089090 (NAMERIKAWA MASAHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US6151964 (NAKAJIMA FUMIO [JP]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US5817940 (KOBAYASHI TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH0868638 (TAIYO YUDEN KK); | [A]JP2005529306 (BAE SYSTEMS PLC.); | [A]JP2002509615 (BAE SYSTEMS PLC.); | [A]JP2002510398 (BAE SYSTEMS PLC.); | [A]JP2001194148 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD); | [A]JP2007195316 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [A]JP2003302222 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2003060254 (SONY CORP) | by applicant | JPH08271258 | JP2000009473 | JP2008028835 | JP2005529306 | JP2002509615 | JP2002510398 | JP2007209014 | JP2002158214 |