EP2274117 - SUPPLY STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Numalliance SAS Parc d'Activités Boîte postale 11 88470 Saint Michel sur Meurthe / FR | [2011/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ETIENNE, Joël 8 impasse des Beaux Faîtes F-88100 Saint Die des Vosges / FR | [2011/03] | Representative(s) | Poupon, Michel Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon L'Escurial - Technopole de Brabois 17, avenue de la Forêt de Haye 54519 Vandoeuvre-Les-Nancy Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/38] | Poupon, Michel Cabinet Michel Poupon L'Escurial - Technopole de Brabois 17 Avenue de la Forêt de Haye 54519 Vandoeuvre-Les-Nancy Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2011/03] | Poupon, Michel Cabinet Michel Poupon L'Escurial - Technopole de Brabois 17 Avenue de la Forêt de Haye 54519 Vandoeuvre-Les-Nancy Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 09724551.8 | 02.03.2009 | [2011/03] | WO2009FR50337 | Priority number, date | FR20080051974 | 27.03.2008 Original published format: FR 0851974 | [2011/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009118495 | Date: | 01.10.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2274117 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2274117 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B21F23/00, B21D43/08 | [2011/03] | CPC: |
B21F23/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/03] | Title | German: | VERSORGUNGSSTATION | [2011/03] | English: | SUPPLY STATION | [2011/03] | French: | POSTE D'AMENAGE | [2011/03] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/03] | 30.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.03.2009 | AT | 21.09.2011 | CY | 21.09.2011 | CZ | 21.09.2011 | DK | 21.09.2011 | EE | 21.09.2011 | FI | 21.09.2011 | HR | 21.09.2011 | IE | 21.09.2011 | IT | 21.09.2011 | LT | 21.09.2011 | LV | 21.09.2011 | MK | 21.09.2011 | MT | 21.09.2011 | NL | 21.09.2011 | PL | 21.09.2011 | RO | 21.09.2011 | SE | 21.09.2011 | SI | 21.09.2011 | SK | 21.09.2011 | TR | 21.09.2011 | BG | 21.12.2011 | NO | 21.12.2011 | GR | 22.12.2011 | ES | 01.01.2012 | IS | 21.01.2012 | PT | 23.01.2012 | LU | 02.03.2012 | BE | 31.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
IT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
MK | 21.09.2011 | ||
MT | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
TR | 21.09.2011 | ||
BG | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
ES | 01.01.2012 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
LU | 02.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
IT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
MK | 21.09.2011 | ||
MT | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
TR | 21.09.2011 | ||
BG | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
ES | 01.01.2012 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
IT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
MK | 21.09.2011 | ||
MT | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
BG | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
ES | 01.01.2012 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
IT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
MK | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
BG | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
ES | 01.01.2012 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
IT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
MK | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
ES | 01.01.2012 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
IT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
MK | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
IT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
IT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
IT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
IT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
IT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/14] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19542895 (DATEC SCHERDEL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 15; figures 1,3 * |