EP2273985 - CAPSULE FOR THE PREVENTION OF CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2018 | Opposition rejected | published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ferrer Internacional, S.A. Gran Via Carlos III, 94 08028 Barcelona / ES | For all designated states CNIC Fundación Centro Nacional de Investigaciones Cardiovasculares Carlos III C/Melchor Fernández Almagro, 3 28029 Madrid / ES | [2015/38] |
Former [2013/16] | For all designated states Ferrer Internacional, S.A. Gran Via Carlos III, 94 08028 Barcelona / ES | ||
For all designated states CNIC, Fundacion Centro Nacional de Investigaciones Cardiovasculares Carlos III Melchor Fernandez Almagro, 3 28029 Madrid / ES | |||
Former [2011/03] | For all designated states Ferrer Internacional, S.A. Gran Via Carles III 94 08028 Barcelona / ES | ||
For all designated states CNIC, Fundacion Centro Nacional de Investigaciones Cardiovasculares Carlos III Melchor Fernandez Almagro, 3 28029 Madrid / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUERRERO, Marta Travessera de Dalt 73 E-08024 Barelona / ES | 02 /
ORRIOLS, Anna Tortonyes 25-C 2°2a E-08242 Manresa / ES | 03 /
MARTÍN, Pablo Joan XXIII 44 Bjos. 1a E-08173 Barcelona / ES | 04 /
RAGA, Manuel Sors 17-21 E-08024 Barcelona / ES | [2011/03] | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstraße 4 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/07] | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/03] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09724677.1 | 25.03.2009 | [2011/03] | WO2009EP53545 | Priority number, date | EP20080153615 | 28.03.2008 Original published format: EP 08153615 | [2011/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009118359 | Date: | 01.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2273985 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2273985 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/60, A61K31/22, A61K31/366, A61K31/401, A61K31/403, A61K31/405, A61K31/616, A61K9/48, A61K9/20, A61K9/28, A61P9/00 | [2015/38] | CPC: |
A61K9/4816 (EP,US);
A61K31/366 (EP,US);
A61K31/403 (EP,US);
A61K31/60 (EP,US);
A61K31/616 (EP,US);
A61K9/2009 (EP,US);
A61K9/2018 (EP,US);
A61K9/2054 (EP,US);
A61K9/2059 (EP,US);
A61K9/284 (EP,US);
A61K9/2866 (EP,US);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/366, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/403, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/60, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/616, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2011/03] | A61K9/48, A61P9/00, A61K31/60, A61K31/22, A61K31/366, A61K31/401, A61K31/403, A61K31/405 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/07] |
Former [2011/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KAPSEL ZUR PRÄVENTION VON KARDIOVASKULÄREN ERKRANKUNGEN | [2015/38] | English: | CAPSULE FOR THE PREVENTION OF CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASES | [2011/03] | French: | CAPSULE POUR LA PRÉVENTION DES MALADIES CARDIOVASCULAIRES | [2015/38] |
Former [2011/03] | KAPSEL ZUR PRÄVENTION VON HERZ-KREISLAUF-ERKRANKUNGEN | ||
Former [2011/03] | Capsule pour la prévention des maladies cardiovasculaires | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/03] | 30.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 14.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.11.2016
23.11.2016
ADMISSIBLE ELLIS IP LTD 53/4 George Street Edinburgh EH2 2HT / GB Opponent's representative Ellis, Michael James Ellis IP Ltd 53/4 George Street Edinburgh EH2 2HT / GB | [2017/06] |
Former [2016/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.11.2016
23.11.2016
ADMISSIBLE ELLIS IP LTD Newbyth House East Linton East Lothian EH40 3DU / GB Opponent's representative Ellis, Michael James Ellis IP Ltd Newbyth House East Linton East Lothian EH40 3DU / GB | 04.01.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.05.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.03.2018 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2018/36] | 27.03.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.04.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.04.2018 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.02.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 15.02.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.03.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | EE | 17.02.2016 | IS | 17.02.2016 | LT | 17.02.2016 | LV | 17.02.2016 | MC | 17.02.2016 | MK | 17.02.2016 | LU | 25.03.2016 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/49] | EE | 17.02.2016 | |
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | LT | 17.02.2016 | |
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | LT | 17.02.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0158429 (BPSI HOLDINGS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 10, lines 7-12 *; | [XD]WO03020243 (LONGWOOD PHARMACEUTICAL RES IN [US]) [XD] 1-8 * examples 5,6; claims 1-31 *; | [XD]WO2004080488 (BAYER HEALTHCARE AG [DE], et al) [XD] 1-8 * examples 18,19; claims 1-19 *; | [XD]WO2005011586 (REDDYS LAB INC DR [US], et al) [XD] 1-8 * example 5; claims 1-24 *; | [A]EP1657265 (SHIONOGI & CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-8* figure 5; example 3 *; | [A]US2007009591 (TRIVEDI JAY S [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [XD]US2007116756 (KOMIREDDI PRAKASH R [IN], et al) [XD] 1-8 * examples 1,7; claims 1-17 *; | [A]US2007166375 (PATEL SHASHANK BABABHAI [IN], et al) [A] 1-8 * example 4 *; | [AP]WO2009022821 (HANALL PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [KR], et al) [AP] 1-8 * example 33; tables 8-9 * | Examination | - LAW M R ET AL, "Value of low dose combination treatment with blood pressure lowering drugs: analysis of 354 randomised trials", BMJ. BRITISH MEDICAL JOURNAL, LONDON, GB, vol. 326, no. 7404, doi:10.1136/BMJ.326.7404.1427, ISSN 0959-8146, (20030628), pages 1427 - 1431, (20030625), XP008145737 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/bmj.326.7404.1427 | - SCHIEFFER B ET AL, "Role of 3-hydroxy-3-methylglutaryl coenzyme a reductase inhibitors, angiotensin-converting enzyme inhibitors, cyclooxygenase-2 inhibitors, and aspirin in anti-inflammatory and immunomodulatory treatment of cardiovascular diseases", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF CARDIOLOGY, CAHNERS PUBLISHING CO., NEWTON, MA, US, (20030619), vol. 91, no. 12A, ISSN 0002-9149, pages 12H - 18H, XP001573308 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0002-9149(03)00429-6 | - HOLZGRABE U, "How stable are drugs Wie stabil sind Anneimittel", PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZEITUNG, GOVI VERLAG, ESCHBORN, DE, (20040101), vol. 149, no. 26, ISSN 0031-7136, pages 32 - 35, XP008145787 | - FEHER GERGELY ET AL, "Aspirin Resistance: Possible Roles of Cardiovascular Risk Factors, Previous Disease History, Concomitant Medications and Haemorrheological Variables", DRUGS & AGING, ADIS INTERNATIONAL LTD, AUCKLAND,NEW ZEALAND, (20060101), vol. 23, no. 7, ISSN 1170-229X, pages 559 - 567, XP008145786 | Opposition | US5442008 | WO03020243 | WO2009022821 | - FEGELY K et al., "Correlation of free salicylic acid content to the water vapor transmission properties of aqueous film coating systems", Poster presentation, American Association of Pharmaceutical Scientists Annual Meeting, Salt Lake City, UT, USA, (20031001), pages 1 - 6, URL: https://www.colorcon.com/literature/marketing/fc/Opadry%20amb/ads_opadry_amb_corr_free_salic_acid.pdf, XP055323873 | - Anonymous, "Opadry® AMB, Colorcon", Colorcon, (20030321), page 1, URL: http://www.fdec.com.tw/static/media/uploads/documents/opadry_amb-1.pdf, XP055325666 | - Sven Stegemann, "Hard gelatin capsules today - and tomorrow", Capsugel Library, (20020000), pages 2 - 23, URL: http://www.capsugel.com/media/library/hard-gelatin-capsules-today-and-tomorrow.pdf, XP008128828 | - DAVID B. TROY et al., "Chapter 45: Oral solid dosage forms", Remington The Science and Practice of Pharmacy 21st edition, page 919, ISBN 0-7817-4673-6, XP055323937 | - Clark A Kelly, "Determination of the decomposition of aspirin", J Pharm Sci., (19700800), vol. 59, no. 8, pages 1053 - 1079, XP008182502 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600590802 | - Anonymous, "ICH HARMONISED TRIPARTITE GUIDELINE, 2003 STABILITY TESTING OF NEW DRUG SUBSTANCES AND PRODUCTS Q1A(R2", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON HARMONISATION OF TECHNICAL REQUIREMENTS FOR REGISTRATION OF PHARMACEUTICALS FOR HUMAN USE,, (20030206), pages 1 - 24, URL: http://www.ich.org/fileadmin/Public_Web_Site/ICH_Products/Guidelines/Quality/Q1A_R2/Step4/Q1A_R2__Guideline.pdf, XP055325580 | - T L Rogers, "Hypromellose", T L Rogers, RAYMOND C. ROWE, Handbook of Pharmaceutical Excipients, Pharmaceutical Press, (20090220), pages 326 - 329, ISBN 9780853697923, XP055325597 | - N J Wald, M R Law, "A strategy to reduce cardiovascular disease by more than 80%", BMJ. BRITISH MEDICAL JOURNAL, (20030628), vol. 326, pages 1 - 6, XP008042512 | - Anonymous, "Simvacor. Summary of product characteristics.", (20050401), pages 1 - 12, URL: http://www.actavis.com.mt/NR/rdonlyres/3231D4F1-BEAF-434A-B273-AF6B7F40554F/0/Si.., XP055325622 |