EP2256142 - CARBODIIMIDE COMPOUND, CARBODIIMIDE COMPOSITION AND AQUEOUS COATING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2015 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nisshinbo Holdings Inc. 31-11, Nihonbashiningyo-cho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8650 / JP | [2010/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Ikuo c/o Nisshinbo Industries Inc. Research and Develop Center 2-3, Oonodai 1-chome Midori-ku Chiba-shi Chiba 267-0056 / JP | 02 /
YANAGISAWA, Kenichi c/o Nisshinbo Industries Inc. Research and Develop Center 2-3, Oonodai 1-chome Midori-ku Chiba-shi Chiba 267-0056 / JP | 03 /
OSUGA, Noriko c/o Nisshinbo Industries Inc. Research and Develop Center 2-3, Oonodai 1-chome Midori-ku Chiba-shi Chiba 267-0056 / JP | [2014/09] |
Former [2010/48] | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Ikuo c/o Nisshinbo Industries Inc. Research and Develop Center 2-3, Oonodai 1-chome Midori-ku Chiba-shi Chiba 267-0056 / JP | ||
02 /
YANAGISAWA, Kenichi c/o Nisshinbo Industries Inc. Research and Develop Center 2-3, Oonodai 1-chome Midori-ku Chiba-shi Chiba 267-0056 / JP | |||
03 /
OSUGA, Noriko c/o Nisshinbo Industries Inc. Research and Develop Center 2-3, Oonodai 1-chome Midori-ku Chiba-shi Chiba 267-0056 / JP | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | Gille Hrabal Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2010/48] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 09725074.0 | 17.03.2009 | [2010/48] | WO2009JP55189 | Priority number, date | JP20080084630 | 27.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008084630 | [2010/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009119389 | Date: | 01.10.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2256142 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2256142 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.10.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/83, C08G18/02, C09D7/12, C09D201/08, C09D175/04, C08G18/79, C08G18/16, C08G18/28, C07C267/00, C08L33/00, C08L75/04, C09D133/08, C09D133/00 | [2013/37] | CPC: |
C08G18/025 (EP,US);
C07C267/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/02 (KR);
C08G18/166 (EP,US);
C08G18/282 (EP,US);
C08G18/283 (EP,US);
C08G18/2835 (EP,US);
C08G18/284 (EP,US);
C08G18/797 (EP,US);
C08G18/83 (KR);
C08L33/00 (EP,US);
C09D133/00 (EP,US);
C09D133/08 (EP,US);
C09D175/04 (EP,US);
C09D201/08 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08L33/00, C08L2666/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/09] | C08G18/83, C08G18/02, C09D7/12, C09D201/08, C09D175/04, C08G18/79, C08G18/16, C08G18/28 | ||
Former IPC [2010/48] | C08G18/83, C08G18/02, C09D7/12, C09D201/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/48] | Title | German: | CARBODIIMIDVERBINDUNG, CARBODIIMIDZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND WASSERHALTIGE BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2010/48] | English: | CARBODIIMIDE COMPOUND, CARBODIIMIDE COMPOSITION AND AQUEOUS COATING COMPOSITION | [2010/48] | French: | COMPOSÉ CARBODIIMIDE, COMPOSITION DE CARBODIIMIDE ET COMPOSITION AQUEUSE DE REVÊTEMENT | [2010/48] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2010 | Translation filed | 23.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/48] | 23.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.03.2009 | AT | 26.02.2014 | BE | 26.02.2014 | BG | 26.02.2014 | CY | 26.02.2014 | CZ | 26.02.2014 | DK | 26.02.2014 | EE | 26.02.2014 | ES | 26.02.2014 | FI | 26.02.2014 | HR | 26.02.2014 | LT | 26.02.2014 | LV | 26.02.2014 | MC | 26.02.2014 | MK | 26.02.2014 | MT | 26.02.2014 | NL | 26.02.2014 | PL | 26.02.2014 | RO | 26.02.2014 | SE | 26.02.2014 | SI | 26.02.2014 | SK | 26.02.2014 | TR | 26.02.2014 | IE | 17.03.2014 | LU | 17.03.2014 | CH | 31.03.2014 | LI | 31.03.2014 | NO | 26.05.2014 | GR | 27.05.2014 | IS | 26.06.2014 | PT | 26.06.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 17.03.2009 | |
AT | 26.02.2014 | ||
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
TR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IE | 17.03.2014 | ||
LU | 17.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 17.03.2009 | |
AT | 26.02.2014 | ||
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IE | 17.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IE | 17.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IE | 17.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IE | 17.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IE | 17.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IE | 17.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/42] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 26.02.2014 | |
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5859166 (SASAKI EIJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * examples 1-23 * * claim 1 *; | [A]WO2007089142 (STAHL INT BV [NL], et al) [A] 1-10 * examples 1-16 * * claims 1-23 * | International search | [A]JP2000007642 (NISSHIN SPINNING); | [A]JP2000313825 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD); | [A]JP2001011151 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD); | [A]JP2000154226 (DAINICHISEIKA COLOR CHEM, et al); | [A]JPH1060272 (NIPPON POLYURETHANE KOGYO KK); | [A]JP2003306476 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD); | [A]JP2000319351 (DAINICHISEIKA COLOR CHEM, et al); | [A]JP2008063442 (NISSHIN SPINNING); | [A]JP2005521758 (BASF AG.) | by applicant | JP2000007462 |