blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2256661

EP2256661 - ELECTRONIC TERMINAL, CONTROL METHOD, COMPUTER PROGRAM, AND INTEGRATED CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  28.10.2022
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.10.2022Refusal of applicationpublished on 30.11.2022  [2022/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd.
7 OBP Panasonic Tower
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2015/14]For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd.
7 OBP Panasonic Tower
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
Former [2010/48]For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MATSUSHIMA, Hideki
Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
02 / MATSUZAKI, Natsume
Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
03 / YOKOTA, Kaoru
Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
04 / HAGA, Tomoyuki
Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
 [2010/48]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/48]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date09725211.819.03.2009
[2010/48]
WO2009JP01240
Priority number, dateJP2008007743525.03.2008         Original published format: JP 2008077435
[2010/48]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2009119049
Date:01.10.2009
Language:JA
[2009/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2256661
Date:01.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP01.10.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.07.2012
ClassificationIPC:G06F21/00, G06F21/24, G06F21/06
[2012/33]
CPC:
G06F21/6209 (EP,US); G06F21/554 (EP,US); G06F21/556 (EP,US);
H04L63/12 (EP,US); H04L63/123 (EP,US); H04L63/1441 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2105 (EP,US); G06F2221/2151 (EP,US); H04L2463/101 (EP,US);
H04L63/1416 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2010/48]G06F21/24, G06F21/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/48]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRONISCHES ENDGERÄT, STEUERVERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM DAFÜR SOWIE INTEGRIERTER SCHALTKREIS[2010/48]
English:ELECTRONIC TERMINAL, CONTROL METHOD, COMPUTER PROGRAM, AND INTEGRATED CIRCUIT[2010/48]
French:TERMINAL ÉLECTRONIQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE, PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR ET CIRCUIT INTÉGRÉ[2010/48]
Entry into regional phase14.09.2010Translation filed 
14.09.2010National basic fee paid 
14.09.2010Search fee paid 
14.09.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
14.09.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.09.2010Examination requested  [2010/48]
30.01.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.12.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.03.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.04.2017
05.04.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
11.05.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/48]
22.10.2022Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/48]
Appeal following examination13.07.2017Appeal received No.  T2562/17
12.09.2017Statement of grounds filed
11.10.2022Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
12.10.2022Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.12.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
21.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
24.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
25.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
24.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
26.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
24.03.2020Renewal fee patent year 12
17.03.2021Renewal fee patent year 13
25.03.2022Renewal fee patent year 14
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[I]  - Ivan Balepin ET AL, "Using Specification-Based Intrusion Detection for Automated Response", LNCS Volume 2820: Recent Advances in Intrusion Detection, doi:10.1007/978-3-540-45248-5_8, ISBN 978-3-54-040878-9, (20030101), pages 136 - 154, URL: http://www.springerlink.com/content/gtvy0d0dexr50x1c/fulltext.pdf?MUD=MP, (20120705), XP055031958 [I] 1-13 * abstract * * page 146 - page 159; figure 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-540-45248-5_8
International search[A]JP2001016655  (ADVANCED MOBILE TELECOMM SECUR);
 [A]JP2003524925  (NETWORK ICE CORP.)
by applicantJP2002334511
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.