EP2252572 - METHOD FOR PREPARING COMBRETASTATIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2013 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOFI 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states SANOFI 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2012/17] | For all designated states SANOFI 54, rue de la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2011/30] | For all designated states SANOFI 174, Avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2010/47] | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis 174 Avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREDERIC, Marc c/o Sanofi-aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France F-75013 Paris / FR | 02 /
LUTZ, Sylviane c/o Sanofi-aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France F-75013 Paris / FR | 03 /
MALPART, Joël c/o Sanofi-aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France F-75013 Paris / FR | 04 /
MASSON, Philippe c/o Sanofi-aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France F-75013 Paris / FR | 05 /
MUTTI, Stéphane c/o Sanofi-aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France F-75013 Paris / FR | [2010/47] | Representative(s) | Gaslonde, Aude, et al Sanofi Département Brevets 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/47] | Gaslonde, Aude, et al Sanofi-Aventis Département Brevets 174, Avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 09725421.3 | 27.02.2009 | [2010/47] | WO2009FR00215 | Priority number, date | FR20080001092 | 28.02.2008 Original published format: FR 0801092 | [2010/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009118474 | Date: | 01.10.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2252572 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07C213/10, C07C217/84, C07C231/16, C07C237/08 | [2010/47] | CPC: |
C07C217/84 (EP,US);
C07C231/18 (EP,US);
C07C237/04 (EP,US);
C07B2200/07 (EP,US);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON COMBRETASTATIN | [2010/47] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING COMBRETASTATIN | [2010/47] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE COMBRETASTATINE | [2010/47] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/47] | 01.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/48] | 16.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/48] | Divisional application(s) | EP12172410.8 / EP2562154 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.02.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]US2003220404 (MUTTI STEPHANE [FR], et al) [YD] 1-17 * column W *; | [Y]US2006264654 (WEHNER MARK [DE], et al) [Y] 1-17* paragraphs [0034] - [0036]; examples 1,6,9; claim 9 *; | [YD] - PINNEY K G ET AL, "Synthesis and biological evalution of aryl azide derivatives of combretastatin A-4 as molecular probes for tubulin", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE LTD, GB, (20000101), vol. 8, no. 10, ISSN 0968-0896, pages 2417 - 2425, XP002955631 [YD] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0968-0896(00)00176-0 | [Y] - ANONYMOUS, "Archimica: "Coupling agent T3P- The water scavenger"", INTERNET ARTICLE, (20061001), pages 1 - 20, URL: http://www.archimica.com/PDF/ARCHIMICA_T3P_Brochure.pdf, (20081015), XP002499915 [Y] 1-17 * document fourni ne contient que les pages 1, 5-6, 8, 10-11, 18 et 20 * |